Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bice, Taylor, Johnson, Carolyn, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Scott, Robert Marion, against Ducky Johnson House Movers Inc, Johnson, Carolyn, represented by Dray, Valerie Prochazka, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER CHARLES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER CHARLES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 20, 2016 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT DUCKY JOHNSON HOUSE MOVERS, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 12, 2017NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS
Date: April 12, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING 05/31/17 11:00 AM CST
Date: May 03, 2017PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF KIM BICE WITH EXHIBITS
Date: May 19, 2017NOTICE OF AGREEMENT TO MEDIATOR AND MEDIATION CONFERENCE
Date: July 05, 2017PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS, EXPERT, AND EXHIBIT LIST
Date: July 14, 2017DEFENDANT DUCKY JOHNSON HOUSE MOVER, INC.'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT DISCLOSURES
Date: July 14, 2017JOHNSON RENTALS' WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST
Date: July 14, 2017DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 30, 2017CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY PURSUANT TO RULE 1.720
Date: September 25, 2017CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY
Date: October 03, 2017NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
Date: October 10, 2017UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT
Date: January 09, 2018AMENDED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENT
Date: January 17, 2018NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: February 01, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event JT - JURY TRIAL on 1/29/2018 0900 AM Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON results CANCELLED on 1/17/2018 | |
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event | RECORDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENT | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | UNOPPOSED AMENDED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR SETTLEMENT | |
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event | UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT | |
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 11/7/2017 0130 PM Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON results CANCELLED on 10/10/2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.