Related Content
in Hillsborough County
Case
THOMAS HARVEY - Estate
Jul 18, 2024 |
Tesche Arkin, Caroline |
Probate or Mental Health |
Formal Administration |
24-CP-002375
Case
KENNETH MART - Estate
Jul 17, 2024 |
Tesche Arkin, Caroline |
Probate or Mental Health |
Formal Administration |
24-CP-002356
Ruling
Estate of: Paul DeRespini
Jul 23, 2024 |
P23-00529
P23-00529 ESTATE OF: PAUL DERESPINI
9:00 AM HEARING IN RE: PETITION FOR FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT OF ADMINISTRATOR AND FOR ITS
SETTLEMENT AND FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION, AND FOR COMPENSATION FILED ON 2/23/2024 BY JOHN
DERESPINI
Need:
1. Verified declaration by petitioner to include current address of Joseph Deno so
court can confirm mailing
2. Verified declaration of petitioner showing compliance with Probate Code §
3. Verified declaration by petitioner to specify whether all charges for legal
advertising, bond premiums, probate referee’s services and costs of
administration have been paid. LR 7.317
4. Proposed Order
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, CONTRA COSTA COUNTY
PR - MARTINEZ-WAKEFIELD TAYLOR COURTHOUSE
COURT CALENDAR FOR JULY 23, 2024
DEPARTMENT 33
JUDICIAL OFFICER: MARK SCHMUCK
Ruling
GDN OF WALCZAK, ETAL
Jul 15, 2024 |
CVPG18-0029822
GUARDIANSHIP OF KAYLEE WALCZAK
Case Number: CVPG18-0029822
This matter is on calendar for an Order to Show Cause issued to the Guardian for her failure to
appear at the previous hearing on May 6, 2024 and for her failure to file the required Confidential
Guardianship Status Report. The matter is also on calendar for further proceedings on the Annual
Review. No response to the Order to Show Cause has been submitted. The Status Report has not
been submitted. An appearance is necessary on today’s calendar to discuss the
Guardianship’s status. The Guardian may appear by telephone. Warning: Failure to
appear on today’s calendar will result in the issuance of both monetary sanctions in the sum
of $250.00, and an Order to Show Cause re: Termination of Guardianship and referral to
the Court Investigator.
Ruling
Conservatorship of CAROLYN NINO
Jul 12, 2024 |
MSP08-01125
MSP08-01125 CONSERVATORSHIP OF CAROLYN NINO
9:00 AM HEARING IN RE: PETITION TO TRANSFER PROCEEDINGS TO VENTURA COUNTY FILED ON 5/1/2024 BY
ROGER BOAZ
Need:
Proof of mailing to Richard Nino at address in petition. Proof of Service attached to
Notice filed 5-13-2024 reflects mailing to him at an address other than that listed in
petition
The Court is waiting for these items:
Report of atty. Matthew Toth
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, CONTRA COSTA COUNTY
PR - MARTINEZ-WAKEFIELD TAYLOR COURTHOUSE
COURT CALENDAR FOR JULY 12, 2024
DEPARTMENT 33
JUDICIAL OFFICER: SHARA E BELTRAMO
Ruling
Limited Conservatorship of: WADE JOSEPH BAER-BUKOWSKI
Jul 15, 2024 |
P24-00374
P24-00374 LIMITED CONSERVATORSHIP OF: WADE JOSEPH BAER-BUKOWSKI
9:00 AM HEARING IN RE: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT FOR LIMITED CONSERVATORSHIP OF THE PERSON
ONLY FILED ON 3/5/2024 BY KATHRYN BAER
Petitioner, mother, still must do the following:
1. Appear at the hearing
Note: Capacity Declaration filed 4-18-2024 states proposed conservatee has
capacity.
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, CONTRA COSTA COUNTY
PR - MARTINEZ-WAKEFIELD TAYLOR COURTHOUSE
COURT CALENDAR FOR JULY 15, 2024
DEPARTMENT 33
JUDICIAL OFFICER: SHARA E BELTRAMO
Ruling
Estate of: Shirley Webster
Jun 27, 2024 |
P23-00789
P23-00789 ESTATE OF: SHIRLEY WEBSTER
9:00 AM HEARING IN RE: FIRST AND FINAL REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND
PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION TO ATTORNEY FOR ORDINARY SERVICES AND FOR
FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED ON 02/02/24 BY JACQUELINE WEST
Need:
1. Compliance with CRC 7.250 regarding any acts taken under IAEA w/notice of
proposed action. (Specifics needed)
2. Verified declaration by petitioner to specify whether all charges for probate
referee’s services and costs of administration have been paid. LR 7.317
3. Verified declaration to state how the attorney fees and costs will be paid. The
Petition states that the petitioner will pay them, but, it needs to clarify if she will
pay the fees from her own funds, since the estate does not include cash
assets.
4. Revised Proposed Order, as needed per above.
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, CONTRA COSTA COUNTY
PR - MARTINEZ-WAKEFIELD TAYLOR COURTHOUSE
COURT CALENDAR FOR JUNE 27, 2024
DEPARTMENT 33
JUDICIAL OFFICER: SHARA E BELTRAMO
Ruling
Estate of Holtzer
Jul 15, 2024 |
23PB-0032160
ESTATE OF STANLEY HOLTZER
Case Number: 23PB-0032160
This matter is on calendar for confirmation of filing of the Bond Waivers. Bond Waivers were
previously filed on behalf of Barry Holtzer and Frederick Holtzer. No Bond Waivers have been filed on
behalf of Eric Holtzer or Erin Holtzer. The Court requires the missing Bond Waivers or a bond posted
in the amount of $67,100 in order to issue Letters. This matter is continued to Monday, August 19,
2024, at 2:30 p.m. in Department 44 for confirmation of filing of Bond Waivers or posting of the
bond. Letters of special administration shall be extended to August 19, 2024. No appearance is
necessary on today’s calendar.
Ruling
Matter of: The Stanley F. and Florence Libera Living Trust dated April 17, 2003
Jul 23, 2024 |
P23-01486
P23-01486 MATTER OF: THE STANLEY F. AND FLORENCE LIBERA LIVING TRUST DATED APRIL
17, 2003
9:00 AM HEARING IN RE: STATUS
--see also line #1--
Need:
1. Appearances
2. Verified declaration by petitioner to include copies of all trust instruments,
including original trust and all amendments, besides the ones already provided.
3. Proposed Order
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, CONTRA COSTA COUNTY
PR - MARTINEZ-WAKEFIELD TAYLOR COURTHOUSE
COURT CALENDAR FOR JULY 23, 2024
DEPARTMENT 30
JUDICIAL OFFICER: VIRGINIA M GEORGE
Ruling
Estate of: Carol Steele
Jul 23, 2024 |
P22-02029
P22-02029 ESTATE OF: CAROL STEELE
9:00 AM HEARING IN RE: PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT FILED 02/20/24 BY
JOAN L MCDOWELL
Petition Approved
Proposed Order Submitted
No Appearance Required
10A. P23-01075 MATTER OF: EVERETT E. AND NORMA J. DELLA ROSA TRUST, DATED SEPTEMBER
9, 1992
9:00 AM HEARING ON PETITION IN RE: PETITION TO REMOVE TRUSTEE AND APPOINT SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE
FILE DON 06/12/23 BY LORI EDDY (SET PER EX-PARTE ORDER FILED 07/17/23)- STATUS OF MEDIATION
Need appearances to report status, including mediation
Notes:
a. Opposition filed by Gwendolyn Winters 08/14/23.
b. Petition for Instructions to Increase Rent filed by David Hanks, set 12/03/24
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, CONTRA COSTA COUNTY
PR - MARTINEZ-WAKEFIELD TAYLOR COURTHOUSE
COURT CALENDAR FOR JULY 23, 2024
DEPARTMENT 30
JUDICIAL OFFICER: VIRGINIA M GEORGE
10B. P23-01075 MATTER OF: EVERETT E. AND NORMA J. DELLA ROSA TRUST, DATED SEPTEMBER
9, 1992
9:00 AM HEARING IN RE: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED ON 02/22/24 BY LORI EDDY
Need appearances