Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Harris, Sally A, Levinson, Scott, Quinn, Christine, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Sussman , Dov, against Craig Latimer, Supervisor Of Elections, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Tesche Arkin, Caroline presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTesche Arkin, Caroline Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 17, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: November 17, 2020ORDER DENYING MOTION
Date: November 18, 2020ORDER DENYING MOTION
Date: December 07, 2020REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: November 23, 2020EMERGENCY MOTION
Date: November 24, 2020REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: November 24, 2020E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: November 25, 2020LETTER TO
Date: November 24, 2020DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT
Date: March 08, 2022DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT
Date: November 16, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: November 17, 2020LETTER TO
Date: November 18, 2020CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 17, 2020REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: November 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2022 | DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT | ||
November 16, 2021 | DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT | ||
December 07, 2020 |
ORDER DENYING MOTION "EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYING TREATMENT OF COMPLAINT" |
||
November 25, 2020 |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X1 - dovsussman91@gmail |
||
November 24, 2020 |
EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYING TREATMENT OF COMPLAINT |
||
November 24, 2020 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed) | ||
November 24, 2020 |
LETTER TO ATTY RE: SUMMONS FEE - dovsussman91@gmail |
||
November 23, 2020 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed) | ||
November 18, 2020 |
ORDER DENYING MOTION Emergency Treatment of Complaint |
||
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO ATTY RE: SUMMONS FEES Judge: Tesche Arkin, Caroline |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.