Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Pmi Mortgage Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Jaquez, Jose D, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Wolfe, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolfe, Mark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE
Date: May 07, 2015MOTION TO - FOR
Date: April 13, 2015SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: February 12, 2019ANSWER OF GARNISHEE
Date: December 02, 2014ANSWER OF GARNISHEE
Date: December 01, 2014CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: November 17, 2014ORDER OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: November 03, 2014LETTER FROM CLERK
Date: November 03, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO - FOR ENTRY OF CONTINUING FINAL GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF GARNISHEE
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING CARNICHMENT AND TENDER OF ANSWER Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF GARNISHEE PUBLIX SUPERMARKETS, INC. TO CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE
Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
SEE DOCKET TEXT CERTIFIED COPY OF CONT WRIT EMAILED TO ATTY WALTER@WSCOLLECTIONLAW Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
November 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT GARNISHEE- PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC......11/03/14 MRW Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
|
November 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM CLERK RETURNING CHECK #4793 FOR $85.00 AS THE FEE WAS PAID THRU THE E-PORTAL ON 10/27/14 Judge: Wolfe, Mark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.