Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Thoma, Cindy Mary, Thoma, John Michael, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Nielsen, A. Richard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: November 16, 2016ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR
Date: December 07, 2016NOTICE OF FILING
Date: September 14, 2016FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: November 16, 2016REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: July 01, 2016REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: May 02, 2016MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 08, 2016REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: July 01, 2016AMENDED ANSWER
Date: April 26, 2016ORDER DENYING MOTION
Date: June 11, 2015E-FILED FINAL APPEAL CIRCUIT CIVIL TO 2ND DCA
Date: December 14, 2016REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: July 01, 2016MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 22, 2015REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: August 08, 2014ORDER ON
Date: June 03, 2014AFFIDAVIT IN OPPOSITION
Date: March 20, 2015MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: September 10, 2014AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 18, 2014NOTICE OF FILING
Date: October 21, 2014ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO MEDIATION
Date: April 10, 2014RESPONSE
Date: May 22, 2014MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: January 16, 2014REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: June 26, 2014COMPLAINT
Date: December 02, 2013PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATION REGARDING SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY
Date: April 22, 2014MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: July 18, 2014AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 21, 2014ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: June 26, 2014RESPONSE
Date: March 20, 2015MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: March 12, 2014RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: September 23, 2014RESPONSE
Date: September 23, 2014AFFIDAVIT IN OPPOSITION
Date: March 12, 2015MOTION TO SET ASIDE
Date: August 22, 2016RESPONSE
Date: June 04, 2015NOTICE OF FILING
Date: November 18, 2014ASSIGNMENT OF BID TO
Date: December 06, 2016MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 18, 2014NOTICE OF INTENT
Date: June 04, 2015MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: June 07, 2016ASSIGNMENT OF BID TO
Date: August 02, 2017NOTICE OF FILING
Date: March 12, 2015NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL
Date: March 15, 2017NOTICE OF INTENT
Date: March 12, 2015REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: December 02, 2013RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: August 03, 2016E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: December 02, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED WRIT OF POSSESSION Judge: Nielsen, A. Richard |
|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE CORRECT AMENDED TITLE Judge: Nielsen, A. Richard |
|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
SRS REOPEN EVENT
Judge: Nielsen, A. Richard |
|
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED PER ORDER DTD 12/4/18 RAN mxs@trippscott Judge: Nielsen, A. Richard |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION
Judge: Nielsen, A. Richard |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING VERIFIED MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSESSION 12/05/18 RAN Judge: Nielsen, A. Richard |
|
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING VERIFIED MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION -- 12/04/18 RAN Judge: Nielsen, A. Richard |
|
November 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION VERIFIED Judge: Nielsen, A. Richard |
|
November 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE H. MICHAEL SOLLOA, JR. AS COUNSEL FOR NON PARTY FNMA Judge: Nielsen, A. Richard |
|
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR ISSUE AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Judge: Nielsen, A. Richard |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.