Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Arnold Ritchie Gilmore Decease, M And T Bank, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case against Gilmore, Eric Ritchie, Gilmore, Gary Earle, Kildahl, Kim A, Nelson, Linda Denise, Of Arnold Ritchie Gilmore, Lin, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL, . Highlands County, FL Superior Courts with ESTRADA, PETER FRANK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeESTRADA, PETER FRANK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 16, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationHighlands County, FL |
|
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by M&T Bank against various defendants, including Linda Denise Nelson, the personal representative of the estate of Arnold Ritchie Gilmore, and other individuals who may have an interest in the property. T...
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 16, 2023SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE)
Date: November 16, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (UNK PARTY #1)
Date: November 17, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (LINDA NELSON)
Date: November 17, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (ERIC GILMORE)
Date: November 17, 2023COMPLAINT FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: November 16, 2023NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: November 16, 2023VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM (234,303.21)
Date: November 16, 2023SUMMONS SERVED 11/22/23 (HEATHER COLON PAGAN) IND
Date: December 27, 2023NOTICE OF ACTION **PROPOSED**
Date: February 02, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (LINDA NELSON, PR OF THE ESTATE OF ARNOLD GILMORE)
Date: November 17, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (HEATHER COLON PAGAN)
Date: November 17, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (UNK PARTY #2)
Date: November 17, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (GARY GILMORE)
Date: November 17, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (HIGHLAND CO CLERK OF COURT)
Date: November 17, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY BY CKW (KIM KILDAHL)
Date: November 17, 2023SUMMONS SERVED 11/22/2023 (GARY) IND
Date: December 27, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (LINDA NELSON, AS COUNEL FOR DEFT: LINDA NELSON)
Date: December 08, 2023NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY (ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT: LINDA NELSON)
Date: December 08, 2023AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT
Date: January 16, 2024SUMMONS SERVED 11/21/2023 (LINDA) SUB
Date: December 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (ERIC)
Date: February 02, 2024SUMMONS SERVED 11/28/2023 (KIM) IND
Date: December 27, 2023NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY (UNK PARTY #1 AND #2)
Date: February 05, 2024SUMMONS SERVED 11/27/2023 (LINDA NELSON, PR OF THE ESTATE OF ARNOLD GILMORE) SUB
Date: December 27, 2023SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (ERIC)
Date: January 10, 2024AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY (ERIC)
Date: January 10, 2024DEF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE
Date: December 28, 2023SUMMONS SERVED 11/22/23 (HIGHLANDS CO CLERK OF COURT) GOV
Date: December 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY (UNK PARTY #1 AND #2) | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1 dismissed 2/5/2024 | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2 dismissed 2/5/2024 | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED TO NEWS SUN BY AG (DEFAULT DATE: 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF FIRST PUBLICATION) - TO: ERIC GILMORE; UNK HEIR, OF THE ESATE OF ARNOLD RITCHIE #1; UNK HEIR, OF THE ESTATE OF ARNOLD RITCHIE #2) | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION **PROPOSED** | |
February 02, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH & INQUIRY (ERIC) | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF CANCELLED SERVICE OF PROCESS (UNK HEIR, BENEFICIARY AND DEVISEE 1 OF THE ESTATE OF ARNOLD RITCHIE GILMORE) | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF CANCELLED SERVICE OF PROCESS (UNK HEIR, BENEFICIARY AND DEVISEE 2 OF THE ESTATE OF ARNOLD RITCHIE GILMORE) | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT | |
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED UNSERVED (ERIC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.