Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) County Civil (15,001 To 30,000) case in the jurisdiction of Gadsden County, FL, . Gadsden County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with KATHY GARNER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKATHY GARNER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 07, 2023 |
CategoryCounty Civil (15,001 To 30,000) |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationGadsden County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
SUMMONS ISSUED & EMAILED TO PL ATTY FOR SERVICE
Date: July 10, 2023UNIFORM ORDER
Date: July 10, 2023STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: July 07, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: July 07, 2023COUNTY CIVIL SUMMONS
Date: July 07, 2023DEFENDANT ANSWER
Date: August 23, 2023PAYMENT ACCEPTED FOR TRANSACTION 202305621
Date: July 11, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE OF RENA WARREN SUB-SERVED (DERRICK DUDLEY, SON) ON 8/10/2023
Date: August 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ANSWER | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE OF RENA WARREN SUB-SERVED (DERRICK DUDLEY, SON) ON 8/10/2023 | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT ACCEPTED FOR TRANSACTION 202305621 | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | This item is temporarily unavailable. | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED & EMAILED TO PL ATTY FOR SERVICE | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | UNIFORM ORDER | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY ASSIGNED: JONATHAN TEKELL | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | This item is temporarily unavailable. | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.