Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Obrien, David, Obrien, Teresa, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case against Americas Choice Title Company, Micieli, Christine, in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with FRANCE, CHRISTOPHER A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFRANCE, CHRISTOPHER A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 21, 2023 |
CategoryOther Negligence Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2069 | |||
April 10, 2024 | |||
April 03, 2024 | |||
April 02, 2024 | |||
April 01, 2024 | |||
April 01, 2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.