Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Johnson, Harriet S, The Estate Of Harry Johnson Jr, filed a(n) Nursing Home - Torts case represented by Wilander, Carl R, against Alvarez, Norma, Florida Facilities Llc, Gulf Coast Health Care Holdings Llc, Hc Navigator Llc, Mf Flagler Llc, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Flagler County. This case was filed in Flagler County Superior Courts with PERKINS, TERENCE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePERKINS, TERENCE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategoryOther Negligence Nursing Home |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFlagler County, FL |
Matter TypeNursing Home |
COMPLAINT
Date: January 15, 2021ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL REQUIRING MEDIATION AND DIRECTING PRE TRIAL PROCEDURE
Date: September 08, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 08, 2022AMENDED NOTICE OF ZOOM LOGIN INFORMATION
Date: March 10, 2022MOTION TO WITH DRAW AS COUNSEL
Date: September 14, 2021MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
Date: March 01, 2022SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY
Date: November 09, 2021ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
Date: October 07, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: November 09, 2021DEFENDANT MF FLAGLER LLCS ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGAOTRIES
Date: August 27, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: July 29, 2021DEFENDANTS NORMA ALVAREZ ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 27, 2021PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: September 15, 2021PAYMENT $480.00 RECEIPT #2021000758
Date: January 19, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- CHARLENE PETRETTI
Date: January 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - NORMA ALVAREZ
Date: March 29, 2021COVER SHEET
Date: January 15, 2021ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
Date: March 17, 2022CORRESPONDENCE
Date: March 16, 2022MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
Date: September 14, 2021PLAINTIFFS AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: September 15, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: December 02, 2021ORDER OF STAY DUE TO BANKRUPTCY AS TO ALL PENDING CLAIMS AND DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE
Date: November 10, 2021MF FLAGLER LLCS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 27, 2021NOTICE THAT CAUSE IS AT ISSUE ((EMAILED J.A.))
Date: June 11, 2021PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANTS
Date: June 07, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: May 04, 2021PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 23, 2021DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DIRECTED TO PLAINTIFF
Date: April 07, 2021DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516
Date: January 15, 2021PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGAOTRIES TO DEFENDANTS
Date: June 07, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- PENSACOLA ADMISTRATIVE SERVICES LLC
Date: January 15, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- MF FLAGLER LLC
Date: January 15, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- GULF COAST HEALTH CARE HOLDINGS LLC
Date: January 15, 2021ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: June 11, 2021DEFENDANTS FLORIDA FACILITIES LLC MOTION TO DISMISS PLAITNIFFS COMPLAINT
Date: April 07, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- NORMA ALVAREZ
Date: January 15, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- HC NAVIGATOR LLC
Date: January 15, 2021SUMMONS PREPARED- FLORIDA FACILITIES LLC
Date: January 15, 2021DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF NURSING HOME INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFS
Date: April 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF ZOOM LOGIN INFORMATION | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL ADDRESS | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF STAY DUE TO BANKRUPTCY AS TO ALL PENDING CLAIMS AND DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.