Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wiggins, Lawrence, Wiggins, Letha, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Manzanilla, Leo, against State Farm Florida Insurance Company, represented by Haralambis, Kelli S, Souwed, Layal, Weissenborn, Sheridan K, in the jurisdiction of Escambia County. This case was filed in Escambia County Superior Courts Circuit with Dannheisser, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDannheisser, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2022 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationEscambia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
COMPLAINT
Date: January 21, 2022DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO EXTEND THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER DEADLINES
Date: July 19, 2023NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: May 02, 2023ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL APPRAISAL
Date: July 19, 2023DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Date: June 27, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD WITHIN FIRM ANDDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSESS
Date: August 09, 2023VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: September 05, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 23, 2023DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT
Date: March 25, 2022AGREED ORDER
Date: March 24, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Date: March 03, 2023AGREED ORDER ON DEFENANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT
Date: February 23, 2022DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: April 25, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEYS OF RECORD AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: February 20, 2023DEFENDNATS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 25, 2022DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY: WEISSENBORN, SHERIDAN K ASSIGNED | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD WITHIN FIRM ANDDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSESS | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO EXTEND THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER DEADLINES | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL APPRAISAL | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY: DUTTON, CHRISTOPHER S ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.