Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Safe Haven Security, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kruss, Ramiro Gustavo, against Manirakiza Nzirubusa, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts County Civil with FERGUSON, III, EMMET F. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2022 |
CategoryComplaint On Contract Or Other Debt - $501 - $2,500 Division: Cc-A |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Civil |
FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 20561 PAGE 1493-1493 RECORDED DOCUMENT
Date: January 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMOUNTS DUE & OWING -PLAINTIFF
Date: January 06, 2023STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT - BOTH PARTIES
Date: October 27, 2022ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL (AGREED)
Date: November 08, 2022NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR MANIRAKIZA NZIRUBUSA
Date: January 06, 2023FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 20561 PAGE 1493-1493
Date: January 24, 2023STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: October 20, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED MANIRAKIZA NZIRUBUSA
Date: October 22, 2022CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4262593
Date: October 20, 2022SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED MANIRAKIZA NZIRUBUSA -PLAINTIFF
Date: October 20, 2022COVER SHEET
Date: October 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 20561 PAGE 1493-1493 RECORDED DOCUMENT | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 20561 PAGE 1493-1493 | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMOUNTS DUE & OWING -PLAINTIFF | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR MANIRAKIZA NZIRUBUSA | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL (AGREED) | |
October 29, 2022 | Docket Event | > CANCEL REASON - STIPULATION FILED | |
October 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 12/8/2022 1:30:00 PM | |
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT - BOTH PARTIES | |
October 22, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED MANIRAKIZA NZIRUBUSA | |
October 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 12/08/2022 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.