Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Chapman, Baker Christian filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Deangelo Deven Davis, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts JSO with BATEH, MICHAEL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2022 |
CategoryCounty Criminal Division: C |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseJSO |
ORDER OF RECALL - PER JUDGE'S ORDER
Date: June 14, 2023CAPIAS TO BE RECALLED
Date: June 14, 2023RULE TO SHOWCAUSE TO ISSUE CAPIAS/SUMMONS FOR VOP FILED -AMENDED
Date: May 26, 2023CAPIAS RETURNED - SERVED
Date: May 19, 2023RULE TO SHOWCAUSE TO ISSUE CAPIAS/SUMMONS FOR VOP FILED
Date: February 21, 2023JUDGMENT & SENT. W/FINGERPRINTS BOOK 20557 PAGE 1426-1428
Date: September 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | REVOKE AND TERMINATE PROBATION | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | FEES DUE BY: 07/10/2024 | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ADMITS VIOLATION OF PROBATION | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | 55 DAYS DCJ; 55 DAYS CREDIT | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | FOUND IN VIOLATION | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ASST. STATE ATTY. INTERN WEST, PAIGE | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ASST. PUB. DEF. LOPEZ BAUTISTA, KEBIN J | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGE BATEH, MICHAEL I | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | CAPIAS RETURNED - RECALLED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.