Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Westlake Services, Llc, Dba Westlake Financial Services, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Piliuiko, Oleksandra, against Monashia Moore, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts County Civil with DERKE, ELENI ELIA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 2022 |
CategoryComplaint On Contract Or Other Debt - $8000 - $15000 Division: Cc-J |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Civil |
NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT OF DEFT
Date: August 16, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING BY ZOOM
Date: July 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS
Date: August 16, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: June 05, 2023ANSWER DEFT. MONASHIA MOORE
Date: December 06, 2022CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4260780
Date: October 20, 2022COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: October 19, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED MONASHIA MOORE
Date: October 19, 2022COVER SHEET
Date: October 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT OF DEFT | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING BY ZOOM | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING ON MOTION 08/15/2023 11:05 AM - ZOOM SESSION (VIDEO CONFERENCE) | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER DEFT. MONASHIA MOORE | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 11/17/22 @ 2:05PM TO MONASHIA MOORE, SUBSTITUTE, ULANDIA BROOKS, CO-RESIDENT - PLAINTIFF | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4260780 | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED MONASHIA MOORE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.