Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Angela Jordan, Keteryna Sheremet, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Heil, David Robert, against Security First Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL, . Duval County, FL Superior Courts Circuit Civil with FELTEL JR, GILBERT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 2022 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness Division: Cv-H |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDuval County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCircuit Civil |
This complaint is filed by Angela Jordan and Keteryna Sheremet against Security First Insurance Company. The plaintiffs allege that they suffered a covered hail and wind storm damage loss to their home on August 3, 2020. They claim that they have fil...
DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE -REACHED AN IMPASSE AS TO ALL ISSUES
Date: August 16, 2023RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S) TO DEFT'S
Date: August 16, 2023WITNESS LIST (PLTF'S)
Date: February 27, 2023MOTION IN LIMINE (DEFT'S) - GENERAL ISSUES
Date: March 02, 2023NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES - PLTF
Date: August 16, 2023MOTION (DEFT'S) TO HAVE DEFT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF DEEMED ADMITTED
Date: February 14, 2023NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE MEDIATION, 08/16/2023 01:30PM VIA ZOOM
Date: March 23, 2023MOTION TO COMPEL (DEFT) DISCOVERY RESPONSE
Date: February 14, 2023RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S)
Date: March 08, 2023MOTION IN LIMINE - PLTF
Date: February 27, 2023MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL TO DEF T
Date: December 12, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF
Date: December 12, 2022REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT'S)
Date: December 08, 2022NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (DEFENDANT'S)
Date: February 14, 2023ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL - P/T ON 4/4/24 @ 945AM RM 712
Date: February 08, 2023ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (DEFT'S)
Date: December 08, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S) TO PLTFS'
Date: December 08, 2022INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF (DEFT'S FIRST SET OF)
Date: December 08, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT'S)
Date: December 08, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - PLTFS TO DEFT
Date: October 19, 2022MOTION TO STRIKE MOTION TO EXTENSION OF TIME AND MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: December 07, 2022NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY -PLTF
Date: November 07, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DEFENDANT'S) TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY
Date: November 02, 2022CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4260989
Date: October 20, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: October 19, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE - PLTFS TO DEFT
Date: October 19, 2022REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (FIRST) - PLTFS TO DEFT
Date: October 19, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: October 19, 2022COVER SHEET
Date: October 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE -REACHED AN IMPASSE AS TO ALL ISSUES | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S) TO DEFT'S | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES - PLTF | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (DEFENDANT'S) DUCES TECUM OF ANGELA JORDAN 11/13/2023 9:00 AM VIA ZOOM | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE MEDIATION, 08/16/2023 01:30PM MEDIATOR G MICHAEL BURNETT VIA ZOOM MEETING ID 672 721 8985 PASSCODE 1 | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE MEDIATION, 08/16/2023 01:30PM VIA ZOOM | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE (DEFT'S) - GENERAL ISSUES | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST (PLTF'S) | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE - PLTF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.