Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
J And J Storage And Warehouse, filed a(n) Other Circuit Civil case represented by Deas, Ralph Robert, against Jw Weaponry And Outdoors Inc, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, FL, . Columbia County, FL Superior Courts with OLIN, MELISSA GATES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOLIN, MELISSA GATES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2024 |
CategoryOther Circuit Civil |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationColumbia County, FL |
|
The legal document involves a dispute between J & J Storage & Warehouse, Inc. and JW Weaponry & Outdoors, Inc., Florida corporations, over an easement agreement for runoff water discharge into a retention pond in Columbia County, Florida. The complai...
COMPLAINT
Date: February 28, 2024DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: March 28, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED TO JW WEAPONS & OUTDOORS, INC.
Date: February 28, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: February 28, 2024CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER WITH ATTACHED PLAN AND PROCEDURES
Date: March 22, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER WITH ATTACHED PLAN AND PROCEDURES | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE- FOR JW WEAPONS & OUTDOORS, INC. ON 3/8/24 CORP (JOHN WOOLEY AS REGISTERED AGENT) | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Judge: OLIN , MELISSA G Assigned | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number CC 246476 | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO JW WEAPONS & OUTDOORS, INC. | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.