Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cuevas, Jose J, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Pena, Victoria, Suncoast Schools Federal Credit Union, Unknown Tenant No 1, Unknown Tenant No 2, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrodie, Lauren L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2014 |
CategoryHomestead Foreclosure $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Final Disposition Form
Date:Mediation Report
Date:Notice of Mediation
Date:Objection to Magistrate
Date:Complaint, Amended
Date:Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Brodie, Lauren L | |
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal Pena, Victoria,Suncoast Schools Federal Credit Union,,Unknown Tenant No 1,,Unknown Tenant No 2, Recorded 2015-11-16 Instrument# 5195446 | |
November 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Correspondence to Judge, from Counsel | |
November 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal Pena, Victoria,Suncoast Schools Federal Credit Union,,Unknown Tenant No 1,,Unknown Tenant No 2, | |
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of Mediation Hearing | |
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation | |
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.