Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Grant, Kenneth Eugene, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOBLEY, KRISTINA K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
ORDER SETTING BOND
Date: September 07, 2021NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: April 08, 2022NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: May 04, 2022SURETY BOND RELEASE
Date: June 21, 2022WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL
Date: March 10, 2022ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF PUBLIC DEFENDER
Date: March 30, 2022PAYMENT $638.50 RECEIPT #143630
Date: June 17, 2022PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST TO CRIMINAL CHARGE
Date: June 16, 2022NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY
Date: June 01, 2022NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR
Date: February 25, 2022NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: February 25, 2022NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR
Date: June 01, 2022NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR
Date: May 04, 2022NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: June 01, 2022NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR
Date: April 08, 2022NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY
Date: May 04, 2022NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY
Date: April 08, 2022NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: January 14, 2022NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY
Date: February 25, 2022NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY
Date: January 14, 2022NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR
Date: January 14, 2022NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY
Date: December 02, 2021NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR
Date: September 22, 2021NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR
Date: December 02, 2021NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: December 02, 2021ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL
Date: December 02, 2021NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR
Date: October 25, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY
Date: October 25, 2021NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: October 25, 2021WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY
Date: September 21, 2021NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: September 22, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: September 13, 2021WAIVER OF APPEARANCE
Date: September 13, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY
Date: September 22, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY
Date: September 13, 2021SURETY BOND
Date: September 09, 2021FLORIDA UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION
Date: September 07, 2021NOTIFICATION TO BONDSMAN FOR DEFENDANT TO APPEAR
Date: September 09, 2021PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER
Date: September 08, 2021FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT DECLARED INDIGENT BY CLERK
Date: September 07, 2021ARREST AND BOOKING REPORT
Date: September 07, 2021NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 7/7/2022 3:03 PM / RECEPTION #: 2022041320 | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEYMC8E | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AEYMC8E | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND RELEASE | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $638.50 RECEIPT #143630 | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST TO CRIMINAL CHARGE | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED INFORMATION FILED | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AEYMC8E | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEYMC8E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.