Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
H & Lk Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Irving, Aaron James, against Alberts, Nancy, Alberts, Nathan, Individualized Educational Services Inc, represented by Johnson, Earl M Jr, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with BORELLO, MARK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2012 |
CategoryContract Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Notice of Unavailability
Date: September 17, 2012Notice of Unavailability Notice of Unavailability
Date: May 24, 2013Motion for Default Motion for Default and non-military aff and proof of claim
Date: October 15, 2012Civil Cover Sheet
Date: September 17, 2012Notice of Appearance
Date: September 17, 2012Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to: Nancy Alberts
Date: September 17, 2012Motion to Appoint Process Server
Date: September 17, 2012Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to: Nathaniel Alberts
Date: September 17, 2012Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to: Individualized Educational Services Inc
Date: September 17, 2012Order Appointing Process Server
Date: September 20, 2012Default as to Nathan Alberts and Nancy Alberts
Date: October 16, 2012Motion to Dismiss/Vacate defs
Date: October 17, 2012Motion to Set Aside Motion to Set Aside
Date: October 25, 2012Notice of Unavailability Notice of Unavailability
Date: November 28, 2012Notice of Appearance Amended
Date: March 26, 2013Notice of Cancellation of hearing set for 9/30/13
Date: September 23, 2013Disposition of mediation conference
Date: September 24, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | 02/13/2014 Final Judgment, Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: BORELLO, MARK) | |
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing affidavit of damages and proof of claim | |
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Order (Generic) Granting Withdraw as Counsel | |
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing third amended notice of hearing; 2/10/14 at 8:30 a.m. | |
January 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing second amended notice of hearing; 1/31/14 at 8:30 a.m. | |
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing 01-21-14 at 8:30am | |
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing 01-14-14 at 8:30am | |
December 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion to withdraw | |
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion for default judgment | |
October 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Order (Generic) approving stip of settlement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.