Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 06, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property <50000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Underwood Residential GC LLC against Franz Berndt Jr., the unknown heirs of Franz Berndt Jr., Citrus Springs Civic Association Inc., and other parties claiming rights to a property in Citrus County, Florida...
COVER SHEET
Date: April 06, 2021COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE
Date: April 06, 2021MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: April 08, 2021FINAL JUDGMENT E - Recorded (OR.3156.443. / 2021025823)
Date: April 19, 2021PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021013704
Date: April 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT E - Recorded (OR.3156.443. / 2021025823) | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF ORDER DATED MARCH 15 2021 IN CASE N 20CA504 RETURNS OF SERVICE AND DEFAULT OR RETURNS OF NON SERVICE AND ANSWER OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM AND PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF FILING | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021013704 | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE FALVEY, CAROL A: ASSIGNED | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: MUTARELLI, RICHARD DAVID JR ASSIGNED | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 04/06/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 000225 A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.