Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Port Charlotte Hma Llc Dba Shorepoint Health Port Charlotte, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Hines, Cassidy, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with BELL, PETER A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 13, 2024 |
CategoryMatters Involving Claims 501 - 2500 |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is a legal action filed by PORT CHARLOTTE HMA LLC DBA SHOREPOINT HEALTH PORT CHARLOTTE against Cassidy Hines for damages amounting to $880.27. The complaint alleges that medical treatment was provided to Defendant on multiple dates, wi...
SETTLEMENT STIPULATION/ SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL
Date: April 05, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: March 13, 2024SUMMONS REQUEST
Date: March 13, 2024SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: April 02, 2024PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2024021255
Date: March 14, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 13, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED CASSIDY HINES
Date: March 14, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT STIPULATION/ SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT STIPULATION/ SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OTHER.0.0. / 3389881) | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2024021255 | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED CASSIDY HINES | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS REQUEST | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 03/13/2024 CASE NUMBER 24000449SP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.