Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mason, Donald H filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Jackson, Montel De Marqus, Mason, Christopher Alan, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with MASON, DONALD H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMASON, DONALD H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 13, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: June 13, 2021SURETY BOND PC701468800 POSTED $5,000.00
Date: June 16, 2021CITATION (TICKET)
Date: June 16, 2021RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: June 13, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: June 16, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD DISC
Date: June 15, 2021SURETY BOND OS610007172 POSTED $5,000.00
Date: January 20, 2022VIOLATION OF PROBATION WARRANT SERVED
Date: January 20, 2022WARRANT WORKSHEET
Date: January 20, 2022ARREST CARD
Date: January 20, 2022JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE FILED
Date: July 30, 2021VIOLATION OF PROBATION WARRANT ISSUED
Date: December 09, 2021PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST
Date: July 13, 2021VIOLATION REPORT
Date: December 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION
Date: December 09, 2021JUDGMENT OF GUILT & PLACING DEF ON PROBATION
Date: July 29, 2021MEMORANDUM FDOC
Date: August 20, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE NOLO CONTENDERE
Date: July 13, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: June 23, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - CHANGE IN PD
Date: June 18, 2021INFORMATION AND NOTICE TO CLERK - EXPEDITED
Date: June 25, 2021BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: June 13, 2021SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET
Date: July 13, 2021SENTENCE FORM AG
Date: July 13, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: June 17, 2021BOOKING REPORT RELEASE
Date: June 16, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: March 29, 2022NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: February 02, 2022FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT
Date: July 13, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE - VOP HEARING 4/21 @ 130PM
Date: March 28, 2022BOND DISCHARGE SLIP
Date: July 17, 20217/11/2022
Date: April 08, 20248/9/2022
Date: April 02, 20247/7/2022
Date: April 04, 20247/5/2022
Date: April 01, 20246/20/2022
Date: April 01, 20246/16/2022
Date: April 03, 20246/16/2022
Date: April 01, 20246/15/2022
Date: April 01, 20246/9/2022
Date: April 01, 20245/26/2022
Date: April 01, 20245/25/2022
Date: April 01, 20245/25/2022
Date: April 02, 20245/24/2022
Date: April 01, 20245/23/2022
Date: April 01, 20244/25/2022
Date: April 01, 20244/22/2022
Date: April 01, 20244/22/2022
Date: April 03, 20244/21/2022
Date: April 01, 20244/21/2022
Date: April 02, 20244/18/2022
Date: April 01, 20244/21/2022
Date: April 03, 20244/18/2022
Date: April 03, 20242/2/2022
Date: April 01, 20244/18/2022
Date: April 02, 20243/29/2022
Date: April 01, 20243/28/2022
Date: April 01, 20241/20/2022
Date: April 02, 20241/20/2022
Date: April 03, 20241/20/2022
Date: April 01, 202412/9/2021
Date: April 01, 202412/9/2021
Date: April 02, 20248/20/2021
Date: April 01, 202412/9/2021
Date: April 03, 20247/30/2021
Date: April 04, 20247/29/2021
Date: April 03, 20247/17/2021
Date: April 01, 20247/13/2021
Date: April 03, 20247/13/2021
Date: April 06, 20246/23/2021
Date: April 01, 20247/13/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/18/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/25/2021
Date: April 03, 20246/17/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/16/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/16/2021
Date: April 02, 20246/13/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/15/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/13/2021
Date: April 02, 20246/13/2021
Date: April 03, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.