Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sheriff William Prummell, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case against In Re: The Forfeiture Of $5,642.00 U.S. Currency, Nichols, Justin, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2018 |
CategoryForfeitures |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 14, 2018PAYMENT $8.50 RECEIPT #2019004317
Date: November 02, 2018DEFAULT - GRANTED - AGAINST JUSTIN NICHOLS
Date: December 06, 2018COURT MINUTES - FORFEITURE, GRANTED
Date: January 29, 2019VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE
Date: September 14, 2018STANDING ORDER FOR NON-FORECLOSURE CIVIL CASES IN CHARLOTTE COUNTY
Date: September 14, 2018PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2018047415
Date: September 14, 2018PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2019004100
Date: October 31, 2018SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED TO JUSTIN NICHOLS, 10/31/18
Date: October 31, 2018BOND FOR FORFEITURE OF CONTRABAND
Date: November 02, 2018SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON JUSTIN NICHOLS, 11/13/18
Date: November 15, 2018MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT - AGAINST JUSTIN NICHOLS
Date: December 05, 2018PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR FINAL ORDER OF FORFITURE
Date: December 18, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING 1/29/19 @ 9:15 AM
Date: January 21, 2019FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE
Date: February 01, 2019FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE - Recorded (O.4430.959 / 2703412)
Date: April 24, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE - Recorded (O.4430.959 / 2703412) | |
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE - Recorded (O.4430.959 / 2703412) | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES - FORFEITURE, GRANTED | |
January 21, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 1/29/19 @ 9:15 AM | |
January 21, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 1/29/19 @ 9:15 AM | |
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR FINAL ORDER OF FORFITURE | |
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR FINAL ORDER OF FORFITURE | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFAULT - GRANTED - AGAINST JUSTIN NICHOLS | |
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT - AGAINST JUSTIN NICHOLS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.