Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Brazill #W16443, Nathaniel R., filed a(n) Inmate Tort Complaint case against Florida Department Of Corrections, represented by Mcdonough, Anne F, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 04, 108 |
CategoryInmate Tort Complaint |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
|
NOTICE OF APPEAL - RECORDED (O.4400.740 / 2678985)
Date: January 25, 2019ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE 2D19-0328
Date: January 25, 2019ORDER - CLOSING CASE
Date: December 26, 2018DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: December 03, 2018LETTER FROM NATHANIEL R. BRAZILL
Date: November 20, 2018PLAINTIFFS AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING ORAL DEPOSITION OF JORJE CHAVARRIA
Date: November 20, 2018PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING ORAL DEPOSITION OF JOHN KINNEY 12/19/18 @ 1:00 PM
Date: November 16, 2018COURT MINUTES
Date: December 05, 2018ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL / NON JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 2/4/19 @ 9: 15 AM
Date: December 04, 2018SUBPOENA TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION IN A CIVIL ACTION - JOHN KINNEY
Date: November 29, 2018PLAINTIFF 'S RESPONSE OPPOSING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DEPOSE INMATE PLAINTIFF
Date: December 03, 2018SUBPOENA TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION IN A CIVIL ACTION - JORJE CHAVARRIA
Date: November 29, 2018PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING ORAL DEPOSITION OF JORJE CHAVARRIA12/19/18 @ 9:30 AM
Date: November 16, 2018LETTER FROM NATHANIEL R. BRAZILL
Date: November 16, 2018AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - 12/5/18 @ 11:00 AM
Date: November 14, 2018ORDER ON EMERGENCY MOTION TO HEAR AND RULE BEFORE NOVEMBER 20, 2018 - DENIED
Date: November 15, 2018COVER LETTER TO CLERK FROM ATTORNEY
Date: November 29, 2018AMENDED NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING
Date: November 27, 2018DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE
Date: November 02, 2018DEFENDANT'S FIFTH AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: November 05, 2018DEFENDANT'S SIXTH AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: November 16, 2018LETTER FROM NATHANIEL BRAZILL AND MOTION TO HEARING AND RULE
Date: November 08, 2018DEFENDANT, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS', MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: November 20, 2018PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AGAINST TAKING TELEPHONIC DEPOSITIONS DUCES TECUM
Date: November 02, 2018PLAINTIFFS AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING ORAL DEPOSITION OF JOHN KINNEY
Date: November 20, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING - 12/17/18 @ 1:45 PM
Date: November 27, 2018DEFENDANT'S FOURTH AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: November 02, 2018PRO SE PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY DEPOSITIONS
Date: November 15, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING - 12/5/18 @ 11:00 AM
Date: November 13, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/SUBPOENA SERVED - OPPENHEIVER & CO - 9/27/18
Date: October 05, 2018DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DEPOSE INMATE PLAINTIFF
Date: November 13, 2018PLAINTIFFS SECOND NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT
Date: October 12, 2018PRO SE PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO HEARING AND RULE BEFORE NOVEMBER 20, 2018
Date: November 13, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/SUBPOENA SERVED - CAPITOL ONE BANK - 9/27/18
Date: October 05, 2018ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE AND NOTICE OF HEARING - 12/5/18 @ 11:00 AM
Date: November 05, 2018DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF TAKING TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: October 02, 2018DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED DUCES TECUM REQUEST FOR DOCUMENTS TO BE PRODUCED
Date: September 19, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/SUBPOENA SERVED - CAPITOL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.- 9/27/18
Date: October 05, 2018PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: September 17, 2018PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM FOR DEPOSITIONS
Date: November 02, 2018ORDER - DEF'S M/EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DISCLOSURE OF FACT WITNESSES - GRANTED
Date: September 14, 2018PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CORRECT CAPTION
Date: August 07, 2018DEFENDANT'S THIRD AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING TELEPHONIC DEPOSITIONS DUCES TECUM
Date: November 01, 2018LETTER FROM NATHANIEL BRAZILL
Date: July 26, 2018PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: October 30, 2018DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CORRECT CAPTION
Date: July 27, 2018DEFENDANT, FLORIDA; DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS', MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: July 12, 2018PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CORRECT CAPTION
Date: July 23, 2018ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - GRANTED
Date: October 22, 2018DEFENDANT, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS', MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: October 17, 2018DEFENDANT'S SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: October 23, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/SUBPOENA SERVED - TD AMERITRADE INC. - 10/15/18
Date: October 19, 2018PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS DUCS TECUM FOR DEPOSITIONS
Date: October 16, 2018PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AGAINST TAKING TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION DECUS TECUM
Date: October 16, 2018DEFENDANT'S AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING TELEPHONIC DEPOSITIONS DUCES TECUM
Date: October 03, 2018PLAINTIFF'S DISCLOSURE OF FACT WITNESSES
Date: September 13, 2018DEFENDANT, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS', MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: September 11, 2018PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT
Date: September 06, 2018COVER LETTER TO JUDGE FROM ATTORNEY
Date: September 14, 2018NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME
Date: July 16, 2018NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING - 4/16/18 @ 10:30 AM
Date: April 02, 2018CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: May 07, 2018PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 27, 2018LETTER FROM D.O.C. TO CLERK
Date: December 19, 2017MEMORANDUM FROM CLERK
Date: November 08, 2017MOTION TO QUASH PURPORTED SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: November 07, 2017PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED OBJECTION TO PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES
Date: August 10, 2018ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CORRECT CAPTION
Date: August 13, 2018LETTER FROM NATHANIEL BRAZILL
Date: August 20, 2018LETTER FROM INMATE TO CLERK
Date: August 16, 2018PLAINTIFFS OBLECTION TO PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES
Date: July 30, 2018ORDER
Date: April 20, 2018AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER
Date: May 04, 2018COURT MINUTES - M/RECONSIDER & REVOKE, DENIED
Date: April 16, 2018SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON FLORIDA DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS, 01/09/18
Date: January 16, 2018ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS' MOTION TO QUASH
Date: December 12, 2017MEMORANDUM FROM CLERK TO NATHANIEL BRAZILL
Date: December 05, 2017DEFENDANT'S, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS', MOTION TO APPEAR TLEPHONICALLY
Date: November 27, 2017NOTICE/EXHIBITS
Date: April 09, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: July 05, 2017REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: July 26, 2017STANDING ORDER FOR NON-FORECLOSURE CIVIL CASES IN CHARLOTTE COUNTY
Date: March 02, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING - 4/9/18 @ 10:30 AM
Date: March 13, 2018NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING - 12/11/17 @ 1:30 PM
Date: December 04, 2017AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 19, 2017SUMMONS ISSUED TO FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Date: December 19, 2017NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE
Date: November 07, 2017AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 25, 2017NOTICE CANCELLING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNCE - SCHED. 12/13/17
Date: December 12, 2017SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - KARA WILLIAMS OBO FL DEPT OF CORRECTIONS - 09/28/17
Date: October 16, 2017AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 18, 2017APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS
Date: July 05, 2017LETTER FROM THE CLERK
Date: August 31, 2017CORRESPONDENCE FROM NATHANIEL BRAZILL
Date: July 14, 2017LETTER AND MOTION FROM NATHANIEL BRAZILL
Date: July 30, 2018LETTER TO CLERK FROM NATHANIEL R. BRAZILL
Date: November 08, 2017LETTER FROM NATHANIEL BRAZILL
Date: July 23, 2018LETTER FROM NATHANIEL BRAZILL
Date: July 30, 2018MEMORANDUM FROM N. BRAZILL
Date: August 10, 2018LETTER FROM NATHANIEL R. BRAZILL
Date: July 10, 2018LETTER FROM NATHANIEL R. BRAZILL
Date: October 16, 2018COVER LETTER FROM PLAINTIFF/NATHANIEL R. BRAZILL
Date: April 12, 2018COURT MINUTES
Date: December 11, 2017LETTER FROM NATHANIEL BRAZILL
Date: November 02, 2018LETTER FROM NATHANIEL R. BRAZILL
Date: August 07, 2018CONFIRMATION LETTER
Date: July 06, 2017LETTER FROM NATHANIEL BRAZILL
Date: December 17, 2018COVER LETTER FROM NATHANIEL R. BRAZILL
Date: September 25, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: July 05, 2017LETTER FROM NATHANIEL BRAZILL
Date: December 06, 2018LETTER FROM NATHANIEL BRAZILL
Date: December 03, 2018ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL
Date: April 03, 201911/13/2018
Date: June 02, 202411/2/2018
Date: June 02, 202411/16/2018
Date: June 03, 202411/15/2018
Date: June 11, 202411/15/2018
Date: June 02, 202411/1/2018
Date: June 05, 202411/5/2018
Date: June 05, 202411/2/2018
Date: June 01, 202411/13/2018
Date: June 03, 202411/2/2018
Date: June 15, 202411/13/2018
Date: June 05, 202411/2/2018
Date: June 05, 202410/22/2018
Date: June 02, 202410/16/2018
Date: June 13, 202410/30/2018
Date: June 04, 202410/16/2018
Date: June 14, 202410/17/2018
Date: June 03, 202410/19/2018
Date: June 01, 202410/16/2018
Date: June 01, 202410/23/2018
Date: June 05, 202410/22/2018
Date: June 04, 202410/12/2018
Date: June 07, 202410/9/2018
Date: June 01, 202410/12/2018
Date: June 03, 202410/3/2018
Date: June 05, 202410/2/2018
Date: June 05, 20249/17/2018
Date: June 03, 20249/19/2018
Date: June 03, 20249/14/2018
Date: June 02, 20249/13/2018
Date: June 04, 20249/6/2018
Date: June 08, 20249/11/2018
Date: June 03, 20248/14/2018
Date: June 03, 202410/5/2018
Date: June 01, 20248/13/2018
Date: June 03, 20248/13/2018
Date: June 01, 20248/10/2018
Date: June 09, 20248/17/2018
Date: June 02, 20249/14/2018
Date: June 01, 20248/16/2018
Date: June 13, 20249/4/2018
Date: June 02, 20249/5/2018
Date: June 02, 20247/30/2018
Date: June 09, 20247/26/2018
Date: June 02, 20247/30/2018
Date: June 01, 20248/10/2018
Date: June 05, 20247/23/2018
Date: June 04, 20248/7/2018
Date: June 06, 20247/30/2018
Date: June 04, 20348/27/2018
Date: June 04, 20247/27/2018
Date: June 05, 20248/21/2018
Date: June 06, 20248/20/2018
Date: June 06, 20248/10/2018
Date: June 01, 20248/7/2018
Date: June 01, 20247/23/2018
Date: June 01, 20247/16/2018
Date: June 02, 20247/16/2018
Date: June 30, 20245/4/2018
Date: June 03, 20244/9/2018
Date: June 04, 1107/12/2018
Date: June 03, 20244/20/2018
Date: June 03, 20243/7/2018
Date: June 04, 1787/10/2018
Date: June 04, 20244/16/2018
Date: June 02, 20243/2/2018
Date: June 03, 20244/12/2018
Date: June 01, 20247/10/2018
Date: June 01, 20245/7/2018
Date: June 01, 20243/13/2018
Date: June 02, 20244/2/2018
Date: June 02, 20242/23/2018
Date: June 04, 20243/2/2018
Date: June 06, 202412/12/2017
Date: June 01, 20242/8/2018
Date: June 09, 20241/16/2018
Date: June 02, 20244/12/2018
Date: June 12, 202412/19/2017
Date: June 08, 202412/11/2017
Date: June 01, 202412/19/2017
Date: June 01, 202411/7/2017
Date: June 07, 202412/4/2017
Date: June 02, 202411/8/2017
Date: June 01, 202411/27/2017
Date: June 02, 202411/7/2017
Date: June 02, 202411/30/2017
Date: June 01, 202410/31/2017
Date: June 03, 202410/16/2017
Date: June 01, 20249/18/2017
Date: June 08, 20249/25/2017
Date: June 08, 202412/5/2017
Date: June 01, 20248/31/2017
Date: June 01, 20247/14/2017
Date: June 02, 20249/25/2017
Date: June 01, 20247/26/2017
Date: June 02, 20247/6/2017
Date: June 01, 20247/5/2017
Date: June 08, 20247/5/2017
Date: June 01, 202411/20/2018
Date: June 02, 202411/27/2018
Date: June 02, 202411/29/2018
Date: June 01, 202412/17/2018
Date: June 03, 202412/17/2018
Date: June 01, 202412/26/2018
Date: June 05, 20241/25/2019
Date: June 08, 20241/25/2019
Date: June 01, 20242/11/2019
Date: June 02, 2024NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: January 25, 2019ORDER - CLOSING CASE - Recorded (O.4392.74 / 2672058)
Date: December 26, 2018DIRECTIONS TO CLERK
Date: January 24, 2019PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING ORAL DEPOSITION OF JORJE CHAVARRIA
Date: December 17, 2018COURT MINUTES - DEF'S RENEWED M/DISMISS, REVOKE INDIGENCY, FOR SANCTIONS, GRANTED W/PREJ.
Date: December 17, 2018SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION RETURNED SERVED ON SGT. JORJE CHAVARRIA, 12/11/18
Date: December 12, 2018DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF PLAINTIFF
Date: December 13, 2018ORDER - PL'S M/PROTECTIVE ORDER - DENIED
Date: December 07, 2018SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION RETURNED UNSERVED FOR OFFICER JOHN KINNEY
Date: December 12, 2018PLAINTIFF'S ADDRESS CHANGE
Date: March 07, 2019PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT DEPOSITION OF INMATE PLAINTIFF
Date: December 06, 2018STATEMENT OF JUDICIAL ACTS TO BE REVIEWED
Date: January 25, 2019ORDER FROM SECOND DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS THIS APPEAL HAS BEEN FILED WITHOUT A FILING FEE
Date: January 25, 2019CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST
Date: February 11, 2019ACKNOWLEDGMENT
Date: January 25, 20193/7/2019
Date: June 03, 20244/3/2019
Date: June 01, 20243/5/2019
Date: June 01, 20241/25/2019
Date: June 02, 20241/24/2019
Date: June 02, 202412/17/2018
Date: June 06, 202412/14/2018
Date: June 04, 10812/14/2018
Date: June 06, 202412/12/2018
Date: June 02, 202412/7/2018
Date: June 04, 202412/7/2018
Date: June 03, 202412/13/2018
Date: June 04, 202412/12/2018
Date: June 07, 202412/12/2018
Date: June 01, 202412/6/2018
Date: June 04, 18512/5/2018
Date: June 04, 202412/6/2018
Date: June 01, 202412/3/2018
Date: June 06, 202412/3/2018
Date: June 01, 202411/21/2018
Date: June 04, 203612/3/2018
Date: June 02, 202411/20/2018
Date: June 04, 202411/14/2018
Date: June 10, 202411/14/2018
Date: June 02, 202411/8/2018
Date: June 06, 202412/6/2018
Date: June 02, 202412/4/2018
Date: June 05, 202411/16/2018
Date: June 01, 202411/19/2018
Date: June 03, 202411/16/2018
Date: June 04, 202411/5/2018
Date: June 03, 202411/15/2018
Date: June 04, 202411/16/2018
Date: June 02, 202411/20/2018
Date: June 01, 202411/7/2018
Date: June 04, 202411/15/2018
Date: June 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2036 | Docket Event | ||
June 04, 2034 | Docket Event | ||
June 30, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
June 15, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
June 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
June 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
June 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
June 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
June 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
June 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.