Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
U.S. Bank, National Association As Legal Title Trustee For Truman 2016 Sc6 Title Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Diaz, Adam A, Diaz, Roy Alan, against And All Unknown Parties Claiming Interests By, Through, Under Or Against A Named Defendant To This Actiion, Or Having Or Claiming To Have Any Right, Title Or Interest In The Property Herein Described, Lamatrice, Thomas F., Unknown Tenant No.1, Unknown Tenant No. 2, represented by Stopa, Mark P, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 152 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Residential Foreclosure 50,001 - 250,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is filed by U.S. Bank, National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust against Thomas F. Lamatrice, Unknown Tenant No. 1, Unknown Tenant No. 2, and all unknown parties claiming interests in the property. The...
ORDER DENYING WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: January 25, 2019ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT
Date: February 12, 2019CERTIFICATE OF TITLE TO RECORDING
Date: July 24, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Date: July 24, 2018CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR CERTIFICATES OF TITLE AND DISBURSMENTS
Date: July 24, 2018NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: July 13, 2018CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Date: July 13, 2018NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE - 7/13/18 - TO BE PUBLISHED IN BUSINESS OBSERVER X2
Date: June 18, 2018ENVELOPE RETURNED UNSERVED/UNCLAIMED
Date: October 10, 2018ORDER FROM SECOND DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS
Date: September 20, 2018ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE 2D18-2882
Date: July 23, 2018EMERGENCY MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL, EX PARTE RULING, AND FOR 45-DAY STAY
Date: September 18, 2018WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED THOMAS F LAMATRICE 2/25/19
Date: March 04, 2019LETTER FROM CLERK TO SHD LEGAL GROUP, P.A. - RETURNED DOC STAMP CHECK #165368
Date: June 18, 2018SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: February 28, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLENESS AS TO ATTORNEY FEES
Date: February 09, 2018COURT MINUTES
Date: February 28, 2018ENVELOPE RETURNED UNSERVED/UNCLAIMED- RICHARD J. MOCKERLER, ESQ
Date: April 25, 2019PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: February 04, 2019ORDER GRANTING EMERGENCY MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL, EX PARTE RULING, AND FOR 45-DAYS
Date: October 24, 2018PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: January 22, 2019ACKNOWLEDGMENT
Date: July 20, 2018COURT MINUTES
Date: September 12, 2018MOTION TO WITHDRAW BY MARK P. STOPA, ESQ.
Date: September 12, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING 9/12/18 @ 1:30 PM
Date: August 16, 2018PAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2018037890
Date: July 05, 2018PROOF OF PUBLICATION FOR NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE- 6/22, 6/29/18
Date: June 29, 2018SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE - Recorded (O.4287.1111 / 2591100)
Date: March 01, 2018ORDER ON JUDICIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (JCMC) - SJ ENTERED
Date: March 01, 2018CERTIFICATE OF TITLE RECORDED IN O.R. BK/PG (4341/22)
Date: July 25, 2018NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE - 4/2/18 - TO BE PUBLISHED IN BUSINESS OBSERVER X2
Date: March 01, 2018COURT MINUTES
Date: June 13, 2018NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS
Date: February 08, 2018NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENTS
Date: February 28, 2018NOTICE OF APPEAL - RECORDED (O.4339.1863 / 2631314)
Date: July 20, 2018LETTER FROM CLERK TO TO SHD LEGAL-NOTICE OF SALE NOT PROVIDED
Date: June 14, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS
Date: February 08, 2018CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Date: April 02, 2018COURT MINUTES - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 10, 2018PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2018026804
Date: April 17, 2018LETTER FROM CLERK TO SHD LEGAL GROUP P.A. - ENVELOPES NOT PROVIDED
Date: April 13, 2018PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 19, 2018ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S DEMAND FOR A JURY TRIAL - GRANTED
Date: October 11, 2017COURT MINUTES - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 17, 2017COURT MINUTES
Date: October 11, 2017MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO FLA. STAT. 57105
Date: October 10, 2017MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S DEMAND FOR A JURY TRIAL
Date: August 29, 2017MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: October 11, 2017ORDER ON JUDICIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNCE (JCMC) - CMC SET FOR 01/10/18 @ 9AM
Date: November 17, 2017ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENSES
Date: October 11, 2017DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR REHEARING OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL
Date: March 15, 2018PAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2018024299
Date: April 02, 2018FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: February 28, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF LOST NOTE
Date: February 28, 2018COPY OF RECORDED MORTGAGE
Date: February 28, 2018ORDER ON JUDICIAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATUS (JCMC) - CMC 02/28/18 @ 1:30 PM
Date: January 12, 2018NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT
Date: December 29, 2017MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENSES
Date: August 29, 2017AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2017ORDER DENYING COURT DEFAULT AGAINST THOMAS F. LAMATRICE
Date: August 29, 2017NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 21, 2017PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: April 10, 2017RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
Date: April 10, 2017DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 07, 2017REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: March 22, 2017SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED - 2/1/17 - THOMAS F. LAMATRICE
Date: January 31, 2017MOTION FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT
Date: March 16, 2017ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: August 25, 2017REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: August 29, 2017MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT - AGAINST THOMAS F. LAMATRICE
Date: August 24, 2017SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT #2 2/18/17 @ 7:50 PM
Date: February 23, 2017SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - UNKNOWN TENANT #1 2/18/17 @ 7:50 PM
Date: February 23, 2017SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED - THOMAS F LAMATRICE 2/18/17 @ 7:50 PM
Date: February 23, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING - 7/25/17 @ 1:30 PM
Date: May 25, 2017COURT MINUTES - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 25, 2017RE-NOTICE OF HEARING - JULY 25, 2017 9:00
Date: July 11, 2017ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S, THOMAS F. LAMATRICE, MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - GRANTED
Date: March 27, 2017CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING - 7/25/17 @ 9AM
Date: June 26, 2017MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT
Date: April 07, 2017DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 07, 2017NOTICE OF DEFENDANT'S INTENTION TO SURRENDER PROPERTY
Date: March 22, 2017NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FILED BY MARK P. STOPA
Date: March 16, 2017SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED - 2/1/17 - UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 1
Date: January 31, 2017PAYMENT $940.00 RECEIPT #2017015639
Date: February 01, 2017NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (O.4164.201 / 2496839)
Date: February 01, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: January 31, 2017VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: January 31, 2017NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: January 31, 2017SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED - 2/1/17 -UNKNOWN TENANT NO. 2
Date: January 31, 2017NOTICE OF FILING - STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES IN CHARLOTTE COUNTY
Date: January 31, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 31, 2017LETTER FROM CLERK TO SHD LEGAL GROUP
Date: June 14, 2018ORDER - Recorded (O.4327.78 / 2621392)
Date: June 15, 2018TRANSMITTAL FORM
Date: July 24, 20183/27/2019
Date: April 01, 20244/25/2019
Date: April 02, 20243/4/2019
Date: April 06, 20242/28/2019
Date: April 01, 20242/4/2019
Date: April 07, 20241/25/2019
Date: April 03, 20242/22/2019
Date: April 02, 20242/12/2019
Date: April 03, 20241/22/2019
Date: April 03, 20241/7/2019
Date: April 01, 202410/11/2018
Date: April 01, 202410/25/2018
Date: April 01, 202410/10/2018
Date: April 02, 20249/18/2018
Date: April 09, 20249/12/2018
Date: April 01, 202410/24/2018
Date: April 01, 20249/12/2018
Date: April 06, 20249/20/2018
Date: April 01, 20248/16/2018
Date: April 03, 20249/12/2018
Date: April 02, 20247/25/2018
Date: April 02, 20248/29/2018
Date: April 01, 20247/24/2018
Date: April 01, 20247/24/2018
Date: April 02, 20247/20/2018
Date: April 09, 20247/23/2018
Date: April 01, 20247/13/2018
Date: April 09, 20247/23/2018
Date: April 06, 20247/20/2018
Date: April 01, 20247/13/2018
Date: April 01, 20247/13/2018
Date: April 02, 20247/5/2018
Date: April 01, 20246/29/2018
Date: April 01, 20246/15/2018
Date: April 01, 20246/20/2018
Date: April 03, 20246/18/2018
Date: April 01, 20246/18/2018
Date: April 02, 20246/13/2018
Date: April 02, 20244/17/2018
Date: April 01, 20246/14/2018
Date: April 01, 20245/18/2018
Date: April 03, 20244/13/2018
Date: April 01, 20246/11/2018
Date: April 05, 20244/12/2018
Date: April 03, 20244/2/2018
Date: April 02, 20244/2/2018
Date: April 01, 20243/16/2018
Date: April 01, 20243/15/2018
Date: April 16, 20242/28/2018
Date: April 07, 20243/1/2018
Date: April 07, 20243/2/2018
Date: April 02, 20242/28/2018
Date: April 16, 20243/1/2018
Date: April 02, 20242/28/2018
Date: April 08, 20242/28/2018
Date: April 01, 20242/28/2018
Date: April 03, 20242/9/2018
Date: April 03, 20242/8/2018
Date: April 06, 20242/8/2018
Date: April 03, 20241/19/2018
Date: April 27, 20371/12/2018
Date: April 02, 20241/22/2018
Date: April 03, 202411/17/2017
Date: April 02, 20241/10/2018
Date: April 02, 202412/29/2017
Date: April 27, 15211/17/2017
Date: April 01, 202410/11/2017
Date: April 16, 202410/11/2017
Date: April 02, 20249/28/2017
Date: April 01, 20249/1/2017
Date: April 03, 202410/10/2017
Date: April 16, 20248/29/2017
Date: April 01, 20248/25/2017
Date: April 07, 20248/29/2017
Date: April 10, 20248/29/2017
Date: April 04, 20247/27/2017
Date: April 02, 20248/29/2017
Date: April 06, 20247/25/2017
Date: April 02, 20248/24/2017
Date: April 05, 20246/26/2017
Date: April 03, 20245/23/2017
Date: April 02, 20247/11/2017
Date: April 03, 20245/3/2017
Date: April 02, 20245/25/2017
Date: April 03, 20247/25/2017
Date: April 01, 20244/21/2017
Date: April 03, 20244/25/2017
Date: April 02, 20244/10/2017
Date: April 08, 20244/10/2017
Date: April 16, 20244/7/2017
Date: April 03, 20244/7/2017
Date: April 06, 20244/7/2017
Date: April 01, 20243/22/2017
Date: April 27, 20513/27/2017
Date: April 02, 20243/21/2017
Date: April 02, 20243/22/2017
Date: April 27, 20633/16/2017
Date: April 02, 20243/16/2017
Date: April 01, 20242/23/2017
Date: April 06, 20241/31/2017
Date: April 03, 20241/31/2017
Date: April 05, 20242/1/2017
Date: April 01, 20241/31/2017
Date: April 01, 20241/31/2017
Date: April 27, 20341/31/2017
Date: April 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2063 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2051 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2037 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2034 | Docket Event | ||
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.