Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Federal National Mortgage Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Knopp, Eric M, Storrings, Jason, against Cox, Cynthia R., Cox, David J., Rundos Equity, Llc, Suncoast Schools Federal Credit Union, Unknown Tenant In Possession Of The Subject Property, (total of 6) See All represented by Belmont, Michele S, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2016 |
CategoryHomestead Residential Foreclosure 50,001 - 250,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
8/30/2017
Date: April 02, 20247/10/2017
Date: April 01, 20246/19/2017
Date: April 01, 20246/30/2017
Date: April 01, 20246/19/2017
Date: April 02, 20246/8/2017
Date: April 01, 20244/26/2017
Date: April 01, 20244/21/2017
Date: April 02, 20244/18/2017
Date: April 18, 20244/21/2017
Date: April 04, 20245/5/2017
Date: April 01, 20244/18/2017
Date: April 03, 20244/18/2017
Date: April 25, 20244/18/2017
Date: April 02, 20244/18/2017
Date: April 04, 20244/18/2017
Date: April 01, 20244/18/2017
Date: April 14, 20244/18/2017
Date: April 27, 20404/12/2017
Date: April 03, 20244/13/2017
Date: April 01, 20244/13/2017
Date: April 02, 20243/8/2017
Date: April 04, 20243/7/2017
Date: April 02, 20244/11/2017
Date: April 27, 20634/11/2017
Date: April 06, 20243/6/2017
Date: April 03, 20242/28/2017
Date: April 02, 20242/22/2017
Date: April 02, 20242/28/2017
Date: April 01, 20242/22/2017
Date: April 03, 20241/17/2017
Date: April 06, 20241/18/2017
Date: April 03, 20241/12/2017
Date: April 02, 202412/27/2016
Date: April 03, 20241/10/2017
Date: April 01, 20241/17/2017
Date: April 03, 202412/12/2016
Date: April 02, 20241/6/2017
Date: April 03, 202412/12/2016
Date: April 06, 202412/12/2016
Date: April 01, 202412/12/2016
Date: April 03, 202412/7/2016
Date: April 02, 202412/7/2016
Date: April 05, 202411/22/2016
Date: April 04, 202411/18/2016
Date: April 03, 202411/9/2016
Date: April 04, 202412/7/2016
Date: April 01, 202410/23/2016
Date: April 02, 202410/20/2016
Date: April 06, 20249/15/2016
Date: April 06, 20249/21/2016
Date: April 01, 202410/20/2016
Date: April 26, 202410/20/2016
Date: April 01, 20249/21/2016
Date: April 02, 20247/29/2016
Date: April 02, 20247/20/2016
Date: April 21, 20247/27/2016
Date: April 02, 20247/20/2016
Date: April 07, 20247/7/2016
Date: April 03, 20246/29/2016
Date: April 01, 20247/7/2016
Date: April 02, 20246/29/2016
Date: April 02, 20246/16/2016
Date: April 01, 20246/16/2016
Date: April 02, 20246/14/2016
Date: April 05, 20246/14/2016
Date: April 01, 20246/14/2016
Date: April 23, 20246/14/2016
Date: April 02, 20246/14/2016
Date: April 03, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2063 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2040 | Docket Event | ||
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 21, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.