Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hsbc Bank Usa National Association As Trustee On B, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mack-Majka, Jacqulyn, Meisels, Jonathan Ian, against Eric Wickson A K A Eric J. Wickson, Maggie Wickson A K A Margaret B. Wickson A K A Mar, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. As N, Unknown Spouse Of Eric Wickson A K A Eric J. Wickson, Unknown Spouse Of Maggie Wickson A K A Margaret B., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2015 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Residential Foreclosure > 250,001 |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
2/25/2016
Date: April 02, 20242/23/2016
Date: April 02, 20242/23/2016
Date: April 01, 20241/22/2016
Date: April 01, 20242/8/2016
Date: April 01, 20241/11/2016
Date: April 01, 20241/28/2016
Date: April 01, 20242/8/2016
Date: April 02, 20241/6/2016
Date: April 04, 20241/7/2016
Date: April 03, 20241/6/2016
Date: April 06, 20241/5/2016
Date: April 07, 20241/5/2016
Date: April 02, 20241/6/2016
Date: April 02, 20241/5/2016
Date: April 03, 20241/5/2016
Date: April 06, 202412/17/2015
Date: April 03, 20241/5/2016
Date: April 04, 202411/20/2015
Date: April 02, 202411/16/2015
Date: April 02, 20241/4/2016
Date: April 04, 20241/5/2016
Date: April 01, 202412/28/2015
Date: April 07, 202412/4/2015
Date: April 04, 202412/4/2015
Date: April 08, 202411/6/2015
Date: April 02, 202410/26/2015
Date: April 03, 202410/26/2015
Date: April 05, 202410/26/2015
Date: April 01, 202410/28/2015
Date: April 01, 20248/3/2015
Date: April 01, 20247/24/2015
Date: April 03, 20247/22/2015
Date: April 01, 20248/25/2015
Date: April 03, 20247/17/2015
Date: April 07, 20246/24/2015
Date: April 28, 20577/24/2015
Date: April 01, 20247/14/2015
Date: April 03, 20247/2/2015
Date: April 02, 20247/6/2015
Date: April 04, 20246/4/2015
Date: April 02, 20245/13/2015
Date: April 03, 20245/5/2015
Date: April 02, 20245/14/2015
Date: April 09, 20245/4/2015
Date: April 02, 20245/7/2015
Date: April 02, 20245/4/2015
Date: April 16, 20244/20/2015
Date: April 03, 20244/16/2015
Date: April 03, 20244/28/2015
Date: April 04, 20244/20/2015
Date: April 02, 20243/27/2015
Date: April 01, 20244/10/2015
Date: April 02, 20243/27/2015
Date: April 02, 20243/26/2015
Date: April 03, 20243/26/2015
Date: April 01, 20243/26/2015
Date: April 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2057 | Docket Event | ||
April 28, 2044 | Docket Event | ||
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.