Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Dragutsky, Jason, against Gottesman, Gary S, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with DePrimo, Natasha presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2012 |
Category* Cc Damages >$5,000 - $15,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: March 05, 2014Order Granting Motion
Date: March 14, 2014Motion for Continuing Writ of Garnishment
Date: January 15, 2015Answer of Garnishee
Date: February 26, 2015Voluntary Dismissal of Garnishment
Date: March 11, 2015Motion for Continuing Writ of Garnishment
Date: January 07, 2016Answer to Writ of Garnishment
Date: March 07, 2016Objection
Date: March 03, 2016Voluntary Dismissal of Garnishment
Date: April 07, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal of Garnishment JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA |
|
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Objection | |
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment Returned Served 02-18-16 - GARN: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA |
|
February 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice to Defendant of Right Against Garnishment | |
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ Fee Payor: JASON S DRAGUTSKY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A003364; ;Amount: $85.00 |
|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event | eWrit Issuance - Garnishment | |
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuing Writ of Garnishment JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal of Garnishment - BJ'S WHOLESALE CLUB, INC |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Continuing Writ of Garnishment Returned Served 2/17/15 BJs Wholesale Club, Inc |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.