Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Greathouse, Eddie, Greathouse, Eddie And Meredith, Greathouse, Meredith, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Singh, Neil V, Esq., against Typtap Insurance Company, represented by Prior, Charles M, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Notice of Video Deposition
Date: September 23, 2022Complaint (eFiled)
Date: September 23, 2022eSummons Issuance
Date: September 27, 2022Civil Cover Sheet
Date: September 23, 2022Request for Admissions
Date: September 23, 2022Motion in Limine
Date: October 04, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: September 23, 2022Request to Produce
Date: September 23, 2022Motion in Limine
Date: October 04, 2022Motion in Limine
Date: October 04, 2022Motion in Limine
Date: October 04, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: October 04, 2022Request to Produce
Date: October 04, 2022Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: October 06, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: October 17, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: October 06, 2022Agreed Order
Date: October 22, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 21, 2022Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 10, 2022Notice of Video Deposition
Date: November 11, 2022Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 07, 2022Answer & Demand for Jury Trial
Date: November 16, 2022Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 15, 2022Request for Production
Date: November 16, 2022Notice of Interrogatories
Date: November 16, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 17, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: December 21, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: December 14, 2022Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: December 21, 2022Privilege Log
Date: December 21, 2022Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 09, 2023Response to Request for Admissions
Date: December 21, 2022Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 06, 2023Order Referring Case to Mediation
Date: August 22, 2023Case Management Order
Date: March 27, 2023Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: June 29, 2023Notice of Cancellation
Date: January 24, 2023Notice of Cancellation
Date: January 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Referring Case to Mediation | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline 03-04-2024 at 10:30 AM |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Order | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply to Affirmative Defenses | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Production | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Privilege Log |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.