Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hincapie, Adriana, Hincapie, Nicolas, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Houston, Andrew Kevin, against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Wezkiewicz, Joseph Bernard, Iii, represented by Blackmore, Adele M, Critelli-Fabiano, Sheri, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRodriguez, Carlos Augusto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed in the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The plaintiffs, Adriana Hincapie and Nicolas Hincapie, are suing the defendant, Joseph Bernard Wezkiewicz, for damages. The complaint alleges that t...
Request for Compulsory Physical Examination
Date: November 02, 2021Response
Date: November 11, 2021Response
Date: November 11, 2021Answer to Interrogs
Date: November 11, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: December 21, 2021Request for Compulsory Physical Examination
Date: January 20, 2022Agreed Order
Date: January 16, 2022Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: January 21, 2022Ex Parte Motion
Date: January 28, 2022Request for Copies
Date: March 01, 2022Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: February 01, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 01, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: February 28, 2022Case Management Order
Date: February 11, 2022Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 16, 2022Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: February 17, 2022Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: February 17, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: February 22, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: February 17, 2022Request for Copies
Date: February 22, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: February 22, 2022Request for Copies
Date: March 03, 2022Request for Copies
Date: February 22, 2022Supplemental Response - Request for Production
Date: March 03, 2022Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: February 24, 2022Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: February 22, 2022Motion to Set Cause for Trial
Date: March 09, 2022Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: May 03, 2022Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: March 10, 2022Order On Case Management Conference
Date: March 15, 2022Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: March 16, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: March 14, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: March 09, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: March 30, 2022Notice of Unavailability
Date: April 05, 2022Request for Compulsory Physical Examination
Date: June 06, 2022Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 06, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: April 13, 2022Request for Copies
Date: April 13, 2022Request for Production
Date: May 13, 2022Request for Production
Date: April 13, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 13, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: June 03, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: May 20, 2022Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 03, 2022Notice of Mediation
Date: May 26, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: May 20, 2022Answer to Interrogs
Date: May 20, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: July 20, 2022Request for Copies
Date: August 30, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: June 07, 2022Request for Compulsory Physical Examination
Date: July 14, 2022Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: June 07, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 13, 2022Request for Compulsory Physical Examination
Date: June 27, 2022Response
Date: June 30, 2022Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 01, 2022Order Extending Time
Date: July 04, 2022Amended
Date: July 12, 2022Request for Compulsory Physical Examination
Date: July 12, 2022Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: August 26, 2022Request for Copies
Date: July 12, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: July 15, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: August 05, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: September 21, 2022Answer to Interrogs
Date: July 15, 2022Agreed Order
Date: July 26, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: July 26, 2022Answer to Interrogs
Date: July 28, 2022Request for Production
Date: September 21, 2022Notice of Video Deposition
Date: August 04, 2022Notice
Date: August 24, 2022Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: September 21, 2022Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: September 21, 2022Notice of Mediation
Date: September 29, 2022Amended Answer
Date: October 18, 2022Request for Copies
Date: September 22, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 05, 2022Witness List
Date: September 30, 2022Request to Produce
Date: October 13, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 18, 2022Witness List
Date: October 07, 2022Amended Complaint
Date: November 14, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: October 18, 2022Certificate
Date: October 17, 2022Motion to Amend Complaint
Date: October 14, 2022Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: January 04, 2023Summons Returned Served
Date: November 28, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: October 19, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: November 03, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: October 21, 2022Order Granting Motion to Amend
Date: November 11, 2022eSummons Issuance - On Amended
Date: November 14, 2022Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: January 19, 2023Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: November 14, 2022Request for Copies
Date: November 18, 2022Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 18, 2022Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: November 18, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: January 12, 2023Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: January 19, 2023Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: February 08, 2023Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: December 12, 2022Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: January 06, 2023Supplemental Request to Produce
Date: January 17, 2023Notice of Non-Objection
Date: January 17, 2023Objection to Non-Party Production
Date: January 18, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 19, 2023Order Referring Case to Mediation
Date: February 07, 2023Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: January 31, 2023Response to Request for Production
Date: February 06, 2023Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 07, 2023Request for Production
Date: February 08, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 08, 2023Request to Produce
Date: February 07, 2023Amended Answer
Date: February 08, 2023Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 08, 2023Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 19, 2023Subpoena Returned Served
Date: March 17, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 09, 2023Notice of Mediation
Date: February 10, 2023Certificate of No Objection
Date: February 13, 2023Answer to Interrogs
Date: February 16, 2023Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 15, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: May 15, 2023Request for Copies
Date: March 15, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 01, 2023Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: March 02, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 03, 2023Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 08, 2023Response to Request to Produce
Date: March 08, 2023Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 10, 2023Response to Request to Produce
Date: March 10, 2023Request for Production
Date: September 14, 2021Request for Production
Date: September 14, 2021Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: September 14, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: September 14, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: September 01, 2021Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: September 23, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 31, 2021Request for Production
Date: August 31, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: August 31, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: August 31, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: August 31, 2021Request for Copies
Date: September 24, 2021Request for Compulsory Physical Examination
Date: October 18, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: August 31, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: October 22, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: September 14, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 14, 2021Ex Parte Order to Compel
Date: January 28, 2022Summons Returned Served
Date: September 14, 2021Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 28, 2022Request for Admissions
Date: September 14, 2021Request for Compulsory Physical Examination
Date: January 31, 2022Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: October 01, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: October 14, 2021Response to Request to Produce
Date: October 21, 2021Request for Copies
Date: January 31, 2022Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 21, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 22, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: October 22, 2021Notice of Video Deposition
Date: October 27, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: October 22, 2021Certificate of No Objection
Date: March 13, 2023Response to Request for Admissions
Date: August 04, 2023Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: July 03, 2023Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 29, 2023Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: May 15, 2023Certificate
Date: May 15, 2023Notice of Mediation
Date: July 18, 2023Motion to be Excused
Date: May 05, 2023Stipulation
Date: May 17, 2023Agreed Order
Date: June 17, 2023Amended Witness List
Date: July 03, 2023Notice of Settlement
Date: September 22, 2023Notice of Filing Deposition
Date: August 21, 2023Request for Production
Date: July 03, 2023Request for Admissions
Date: July 06, 2023Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories
Date: July 11, 2023Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 31, 2023Request for Copies
Date: July 31, 2023Notice of Mediation
Date: August 04, 2023Expert Witness List
Date: July 31, 2023Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: August 17, 2023Motion for Sanctions
Date: August 21, 2023Notice of Reassignment
Date: August 01, 2023Certificate
Date: August 11, 2023Notice
Date: September 19, 2023Certificate
Date: September 01, 2023Notice of Compliance
Date: September 19, 2023Order Granting Leave to Amend Complaint
Date: November 11, 2022Agreed Order
Date: February 08, 2023Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 21, 2022Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: November 07, 2022Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: March 16, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: August 31, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: August 31, 2021Response
Date: November 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Party: Plaintiff Hincapie, Adriana Plaintiff Hincapie, Nicolas |
|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD AND DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMTION AND NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516(b)(1) AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES |
|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY. (Amended)Party: Defendant Wezkiewicz, Joseph Bernard, Jr. |
|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Deposition | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Sanctions | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Disclosure of Expert Witness | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITYParty: Defendant Wezkiewicz, Joseph Bernard, Jr. |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.