Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Furer, Joy, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Bodenheimer, Zachary Dylan, Courtney, Daniel W, against Designedvr Holdings Llc, Gg Re Hollywood Beach 613 Llc, Relaxpro Llc, represented by Corbo, Alicia Marie, Glenn, John Glenn, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrink, Keathan B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Joy Furer against GG RE HOLLYWOOD BEACH 613 LLC in the Circuit Court of the 177th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of the defendant, GG RE HOLLYWOOD BEACH 613 LLC, in...
Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 17, 2022Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 06, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: May 24, 2022Request for Production
Date: May 03, 2022Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: May 24, 2022Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 24, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: May 11, 2022Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: May 03, 2022Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: May 24, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 10, 2022Request for Production
Date: May 25, 2022Request for Admissions
Date: May 25, 2022Request for Copies
Date: May 27, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: June 02, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: May 31, 2022Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 02, 2022Certificate of No Objection
Date: June 06, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: June 16, 2022Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 23, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: June 28, 2022Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 25, 2022Request for Production
Date: June 02, 2022Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: June 28, 2022Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: June 30, 2022Request for Production
Date: June 30, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: June 30, 2022Objection to Notice Production Under Rule 1.351
Date: June 30, 2022Response to Request to Produce
Date: July 06, 2022Request for Production
Date: July 01, 2022Response to Request for Admissions
Date: July 06, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 26, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 25, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: August 04, 2022Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 06, 2022Notice of Compliance
Date: August 05, 2022Notice of Video Deposition
Date: July 25, 2022Agreed Order
Date: July 28, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: August 12, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 15, 2022Motion to Withdraw
Date: August 12, 2022Order Granting Motion to Withdraw
Date: September 01, 2022Witness List
Date: January 02, 2023Notice of Appearance
Date: September 29, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: October 21, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: September 08, 2022Notice
Date: October 12, 2022Witness List
Date: January 03, 2023Witness List
Date: December 30, 2022Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 12, 2022Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 12, 2022Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: January 06, 2023Motion for Continuance
Date: January 12, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: January 12, 2023Notice of Non Objection to Production
Date: January 27, 2023Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: January 25, 2023Request for Production
Date: January 17, 2023Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: January 17, 2023Response to Request for Copies
Date: February 23, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 10, 2023Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 13, 2023Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: March 15, 2023Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part
Date: February 16, 2023Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 24, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 15, 2023Objection
Date: March 01, 2023Notice of Mediation
Date: March 22, 2023Request to Produce
Date: February 27, 2023Notice of Medical Exam
Date: February 27, 2023Expert Witness List
Date: March 17, 2023Notice of Interrogatories
Date: March 01, 2023Request for Production
Date: March 01, 2023Agreed Order
Date: March 08, 2023Notice of Conflict
Date: March 02, 2023Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: March 24, 2023Certificate of No Objection
Date: March 30, 2023Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: March 29, 2023Mediation Report
Date: April 19, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: April 21, 2023Motion in Limine
Date: April 26, 2023Motion in Limine
Date: April 28, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 04, 2023Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: April 28, 2023Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 28, 2023Motion in Limine
Date: April 24, 2023Notice of Cancellation
Date: April 25, 2023Motion for Continuance
Date: April 28, 2023Calendar Call-Order Resetting Trial
Date: May 14, 2023Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: May 24, 2023Notice of Unavailability
Date: May 10, 2023Request for Production
Date: May 16, 2023Order Denying Motion to Strike
Date: May 14, 2023Notice of Non-Objection
Date: May 31, 2023Notice of Video Deposition
Date: May 19, 2023Notice of Unavailability
Date: May 16, 2023Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: May 22, 2023Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: May 24, 2023Notice of Compliance
Date: May 22, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: May 23, 2023Request for Production
Date: May 23, 2023Reply
Date: May 30, 2023Notice
Date: May 26, 2023Notice of Non-Objection
Date: May 30, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 24, 2023Notice of Video Deposition
Date: May 24, 2023Response to Motion
Date: May 24, 2023Notice of Medical Exam
Date: May 31, 2023Motion
Date: May 24, 2023Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 30, 2023Request for Production
Date: May 30, 2023Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 06, 2023Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: June 15, 2023Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: June 16, 2023Response to Request for Admissions
Date: June 15, 2023Request for Production
Date: June 07, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: June 08, 2023Disclosure of Expert Witness
Date: June 09, 2023Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: June 07, 2023Request for Production
Date: June 19, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: June 06, 2023Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: June 12, 2023Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: June 20, 2023Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 23, 2023Certificate of No Objection
Date: June 16, 2023Notice of Medical Exam
Date: June 16, 2023Cross Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: July 10, 2023Response to Request for Production
Date: June 23, 2023Amended Witness List
Date: July 10, 2023Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: June 27, 2023Order Granting Motion
Date: June 26, 2023Order Granting Motion
Date: June 26, 2023Notice of Compliance
Date: June 29, 2023Motion
Date: July 07, 2023Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 25, 2023Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: July 24, 2023Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: July 10, 2023Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: July 17, 2023Motion in Limine
Date: July 17, 2023Motion for Sanctions
Date: July 21, 2023Motion to be Excused
Date: July 24, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: July 10, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: July 20, 2023Motion
Date: July 28, 2023Amended Motion
Date: July 24, 2023Disclosure of Exhibits
Date: July 28, 2023Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 25, 2023Motion to Seal
Date: July 25, 2023Notice of Unavailability
Date: July 25, 2023Request for Production
Date: July 28, 2023Request for Production
Date: July 25, 2023Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: July 28, 2023Request for Copies
Date: July 28, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: August 01, 2023Order Extending Time
Date: July 30, 2023Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: July 31, 2023Certificate of No Objection
Date: August 08, 2023Agreed Order
Date: August 09, 2023Response to Motion
Date: August 07, 2023Calendar Call-Order Resetting Trial
Date: August 09, 2023Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 01, 2023Consent
Date: August 08, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: August 09, 2023Motion to Strike Expert Witness
Date: August 18, 2023Notice of Compliance
Date: August 16, 2023Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: August 22, 2023Request for Production
Date: August 22, 2023Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: September 05, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: May 03, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: May 03, 2023Notice of Non-Compliance
Date: May 09, 2023Request for Production
Date: May 03, 2023Response to Motion
Date: May 09, 2023Motion
Date: May 05, 2023Motion in Limine
Date: May 09, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: May 09, 2023Notice
Date: May 09, 2023Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: May 10, 2023Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: May 22, 2023Civil Cover Sheet
Date: August 31, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC
Date: August 31, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 31, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: September 29, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: October 26, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: September 21, 2021Notice of Interrogatories
Date: September 28, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: September 28, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: November 10, 2021Request for Production
Date: September 28, 2021Request to Produce
Date: November 10, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: November 12, 2021Notice of Interrogatories
Date: November 10, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: November 12, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: November 12, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: December 20, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: December 20, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: January 19, 2022Notice of Filing Interrogs
Date: January 19, 2022Motion to Amend Complaint
Date: January 21, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: January 19, 2022Order Granting Leave to Amend Complaint
Date: February 02, 2022eSummons Issuance - On Amended
Date: February 10, 2022Summons Returned Served
Date: February 16, 2022Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 21, 2022Request for Production
Date: February 11, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: April 13, 2022Case Management Order
Date: February 07, 2022Notice of Filing Interrogs
Date: February 11, 2022Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 18, 2022Motion to Amend Complaint
Date: April 13, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: April 15, 2022Motion for Protective Order
Date: April 13, 2022Order Granting Leave to Amend Complaint
Date: April 18, 2022Case Management Order
Date: April 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351) | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Expert Witness Party: Defendant GG RE Hollywood Beach 613 LLC |
|
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Compliance | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT GG RE HOLLYWOOD BEACH 613 LLC S JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ETEND PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call-Order Resetting Trial Calendar Call will be 11-13-2023 10:00 AM in Courtroom 16155 or Zoom |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Consent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.