Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bruner, Aaron, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Duffy, Vincent, against Judson, Bonnie, represented by Pita, Brian Scott, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Olefson, Shari Africk presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOlefson, Shari Africk Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed in the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit in Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff, Aaron Bruner, is suing the defendant, Bonnie Judson, for damages exceeding $30,000. The plaintiff alleges that on December 29, 2020, ...
Subpoena Returned Served
Date: January 19, 2023Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: December 01, 2022Subpoena Returned Served
Date: January 19, 2023Certificate of No Objection
Date: January 13, 2023Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: January 12, 2023Order Resetting
Date: January 11, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: January 05, 2023Notice of Video Deposition
Date: January 18, 2023Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: January 12, 2023Subpoena Returned Served
Date: January 20, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: January 25, 2023Response to Motion for Judgment
Date: February 16, 2023Notice of Mediation
Date: February 01, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: February 16, 2023Statement of Facts
Date: February 02, 20234th DCA Order
Date: June 09, 2023Notice
Date: August 16, 2023Order Resetting
Date: February 24, 2023Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: March 08, 20234th DCA Order
Date: August 25, 20234th DCA Order
Date: August 24, 2023Motion for Order
Date: March 28, 2023Motion
Date: April 14, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: April 28, 2023Notice of Appeal
Date: June 08, 2023Order
Date: May 10, 2023Amended Notice of Appeal
Date: June 09, 20234th DCA Order
Date: June 09, 2023Acknowledgment
Date: June 09, 2023Directions to the Clerk
Date: June 21, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: July 12, 2023Final Bill Appeal Preparation fees pending in amount of:
Date: July 25, 2023Appeal Record Completed
Date: July 25, 2023Notice
Date: September 27, 2023Notice of Video Deposition
Date: August 31, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: August 31, 2021Request for Production
Date: August 31, 2021Interrogatories
Date: August 31, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: August 31, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: August 31, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 31, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: August 31, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: September 10, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: September 27, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 27, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: September 27, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: September 27, 2021Notice of Unavailability
Date: September 28, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 06, 2021Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 11, 2021Request to Produce
Date: October 12, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: October 12, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: October 12, 2021Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: October 13, 2021Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: October 13, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 21, 2021Certificate of No Objection
Date: October 25, 2021Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: October 28, 2021Subpoena Returned Served
Date: November 02, 2021Subpoena Returned Served
Date: November 02, 2021Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: November 02, 2021Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: November 04, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: November 08, 2021Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: November 12, 2021Privilege Log
Date: November 22, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: November 22, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: November 22, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: December 01, 2021Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: December 06, 2021Case Management Order
Date: January 06, 2022Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 21, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: January 21, 2022Response to Request for Admissions
Date: January 21, 2022Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 29, 2022Motion for Order to Show Cause
Date: February 03, 2022Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: February 04, 2022Order
Date: February 14, 2022Order on Motion to Compel
Date: February 14, 2022Response to Request for Production
Date: March 03, 2022Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice 4D23-1412 // Notice of Payments Received and Returned |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
4th DCA Order Pursuant to the August 25,2023 notice of voluntary dismissal, this case is dismissed |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
4th DCA Order ORDERED that appellant shall file a report, within five (5) days from the date of this order, as to he status of the payment for and preparation of the record on appeal |
|
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice 4D23-1412 Notice of Inability |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Bill Appeal Preparation fees pending in amount of: 4D23-1412 $262.50 // E-Mailed to Appellant Atty |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appeal Record Completed 4D23-1412 // E-Mailed to All Parties |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Directions to the Clerk Party: Plaintiff Bruner, Aaron |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
4th DCA Order ORDERED that appellant shall pay the $300.00 filing fee or file the lower tribunal clerk's determinaion of indigent status in this court within ten CIO) days from the date of this order |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice of Appeal Party: Plaintiff Bruner, Aaron |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.