Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
First Citizens Bank & Trust Company, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Winarsky, Amy Jill, against Guzi, Ohad, Guzi'S Investments Llc, Miami S&E Group Inc, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Casey, Daniel A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCasey, Daniel A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Notice
Date: September 30, 2022Order Denying
Date: October 09, 2022Request
Date: July 22, 2022Notice
Date: July 22, 2022Order Granting Motion for Judgment
Date: June 14, 2022Order Granting Motion for Judgment
Date: May 25, 2022Certificate of Mailing
Date: October 24, 2022Motion for Contempt
Date: January 24, 2023Subpoena Returned Served
Date: November 04, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: June 06, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: February 10, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: February 10, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: September 16, 2022Affidavit in Support of Motion
Date: February 10, 2023Memorandum of Law
Date: February 10, 2023Order Granting Motion
Date: July 05, 2023Motion for Contempt
Date: May 24, 2023eSummons Issuance
Date: June 17, 2021Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing
Date: June 17, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: June 17, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: June 17, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: June 24, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: June 17, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: June 17, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: June 18, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: June 24, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: July 01, 2021Motion for Default & Default
Date: July 30, 2021Answer
Date: July 27, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 10, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: February 07, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: April 19, 2022Affidavit of Costs
Date: May 24, 2022Subpoena for Deposition Duces Tecum Returned Unserved
Date: July 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Compelling Deposition |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Contempt Party: Plaintiff First Citizens Bank & Trust Company |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike MOTION FOR CONTEMPT |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Party: Defendant Guzi, Ohad |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Support of Motion Party: Defendant Guzi, Ohad |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Law Party: Defendant Guzi, Ohad |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Contempt Party: Plaintiff First Citizens Bank & Trust Company |
|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Served on the 3rd day of November, 2022 at 2:42 pmParty: Defendant Guzi, Ohad |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing OF ORDERParty: Plaintiff First Citizens Bank & Trust Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.