Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Guerrero, George, Qureshi, Irma, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Francisco, Touron, Iii, Ruiz, Amy E, against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Galka, Ryan Jamie, Strudwick, Joshua, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Haimes, David A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHaimes, David A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
|
Motion for Final Judgment
Date: February 24, 2023Exhibit Worksheet
Date: February 24, 2023Jury Panel Information List
Date: February 24, 2023Reply
Date: May 22, 2023Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: April 05, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: May 04, 2023Response to Motion
Date: April 13, 2023Motion for Directed Verdict
Date: March 09, 2023Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 09, 2023Motion for New Trial
Date: March 09, 2023Statement of Facts
Date: March 09, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: May 23, 2023Motion for Sanctions
Date: May 26, 2023Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: May 25, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: May 25, 2023Order Denying
Date: May 30, 2023Notice of Limited Appearance
Date: May 31, 2023Notice of Appeal
Date: May 31, 2023Acknowledgment
Date: June 02, 20234th DCA Order
Date: June 02, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: June 02, 2023Surety Bond
Date: June 05, 2023Final Bill Appeal Preparation fees pending in amount of:
Date: July 07, 2023Appeal Record Completed
Date: July 07, 2023Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: September 18, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: September 22, 2023Complaint (eFiled)
Date: April 09, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: April 09, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: April 09, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: April 09, 2021Request for Production
Date: April 09, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: April 09, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: April 12, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: April 13, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: May 03, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 07, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: May 10, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: May 19, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 24, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: June 02, 2021Request for Production
Date: June 02, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: June 02, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: June 04, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: June 11, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: July 02, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: July 05, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 05, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 06, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 06, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 18, 2021Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: August 18, 2021Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: August 18, 2021Notice of Compliance
Date: August 19, 2021Notice of Compliance
Date: August 22, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: September 15, 2021Notice of Charging Lien
Date: November 08, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: November 05, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: November 30, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 30, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: December 01, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: December 02, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: December 03, 2021Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: December 20, 2021Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 08, 2022Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 25, 2022Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: January 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appeal Record Transmitted to 4DCA 4D23-1338/ KH |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Bill Appeal Preparation fees pending in amount of: $402.50 (4D23-1338)/ KH |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appeal Record Completed 4D23-1338/ KH |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Surety Bond for $73,479.00 |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment 4D23-1338/ KH |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
4th DCA Order 4D23-1338; KH/ The jurisdiction of this court was invoked by filing of a Notice of Appeal in the ower tribunal. |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Limited Appearance AS APPELLATE COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSESParty: Defendant Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.