Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Noel, Jimmy, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Duboff, Kenneth, against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, represented by Arenas, Ana Cristina, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Olefson, Shari Africk presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2021 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Jimmy Noel against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation in the Circuit Court of Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff alleges that they suffered a covered loss on November 10, 2020, due to an accidental discharge of wat...
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: March 25, 2021Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO
Date: March 25, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: March 25, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: March 25, 2021Request for Production
Date: March 25, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: March 25, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: March 25, 2021Complaint (eFiled)
Date: March 25, 2021Notice of Acceptance of Service of Process
Date: April 02, 2021Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: April 16, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 22, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: April 16, 2021Reply
Date: April 26, 2021Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 26, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: May 17, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: May 06, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: May 17, 2021Request for Production
Date: May 27, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: May 17, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: May 27, 2021Order Extending Time
Date: May 24, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: June 01, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: May 27, 2021Response to Request for Admissions
Date: June 11, 2021Case Management Order
Date: August 13, 2021Agreed Order Granting
Date: July 27, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 31, 2021Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories
Date: December 21, 2021Joint Stipulation
Date: October 13, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: October 22, 2021Response to Request for Production
Date: October 25, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 25, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: December 22, 2021Notice of Withdrawal
Date: December 23, 2021Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: March 30, 2022Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: September 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY RELATED TO CLAIMS HANDLING,, BAD FAITH, AND POLICY INTERPRETATIONParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine TO PREVENT IMPROPER CLOSING ARGUMENTParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Witness & Exhibit List | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE, KEYISHA HART, IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDMENTParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Affidavit OF DESK/FIELD ADJUSTER, ANTHONY TESTA, IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENTParty: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Party: Defendant Citizens Property Insurance Corporation |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Mediation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.