Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case represented by Freer, Christine, Samis, Scot E, against Watson, Norval, represented by Ducheine, L Dick, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts with Judge AP, Appeals presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge AP, Appeals Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryAppeal (County Court) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
4th DCA Order
Date: February 01, 20214th DCA Order
Date: April 12, 2021Acknowledgment
Date: February 01, 20214th DCA Order
Date: March 12, 2021Pre-billed Appellant pending payment of:
Date: January 04, 2021Acknowledgment
Date: January 04, 2021Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal
Date: January 04, 2021Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief
Date: January 05, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: January 05, 2021Order
Date: January 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
4th DCA Order Upon consideration of appellant's March 15, 2021 response, it is ORDERED that appellee's March 12, 221 motion for attorney's fees is granted conditioned on the trial court determining that appellee i the prevailing party and, if so, setting the amount of the attorney's fees to be awarded for this ppellate case. If a motion for rehearing is filed in this court, then services rendered in connectin with the filing of the motion, including but not limited to preparation of a responsive pleading,shall be taken into account in computing the |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
4th DCA Order Pursuant to the March 12, 2021 notice of voluntary dismissal, this case is dismissed |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
4th DCA Order 4D21-0662/ Upon consideration of the clerk of the lower tribunal's notification that appellant(s) di not pay the filing fee or obtain a waiver of the filing fee before this case was transferred from |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment 4D21-0662 |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TRANSFERRING APPEAL TO THE FOURTH DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Pre-billed Appellant pending payment of: | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.