Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lindeman, William Mark, against Warren Knight, David Charles, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 15, 2019 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
eSummons Issuance
Date: October 15, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: October 15, 2019Summons Returned Unserved
Date: January 30, 2020eSummons Issuance - On Amended
Date: August 31, 2020Civil Cover Sheet
Date: October 15, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: August 31, 2020Summons Returned Served
Date: September 21, 2020Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 30, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: January 05, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: February 03, 2021Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Date: March 16, 2021Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: March 25, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: April 07, 2021Request to Produce
Date: April 07, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: April 07, 2021Response
Date: April 25, 2021Answer to Interrogs
Date: April 22, 2021Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial
Date: May 09, 2021Motion for Summary Final Judgment
Date: May 17, 2021Request to Produce
Date: April 26, 2021Response to Request to Produce
Date: May 20, 2021Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint
Date: May 13, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: May 27, 2021Certificate of Mailing
Date: August 23, 2021eWrit Issuance - Execution
Date: August 30, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: October 01, 2021Motion to Appear Telephonically
Date: October 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Warren Knight, David Charles |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Appear Telephonically Party: Defendant Warren Knight, David Charles |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
eWrit Issuance - Execution Deft: David Charles Warren Knight/ $ 43,418.52/ Rate: FL Stat |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing Party: Plaintiff Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Response to Request to Produce | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Final Judgment Party: Plaintiff Amerisure Mutual Insurance Company |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint Party: Defendant Warren Knight, David Charles |
|
May 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Produce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.