Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
1900 Capital Trust Ii, By U.S. Bank Trust National Association,, Specialized Loan Servicing Llc, Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb, As Owner Trustee Of The Residential Credit Opportunities Trust Vii-A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Leider, Matthew B, Esq., Smallbach, Harrison S, against Bernard Barnor, Elsie, Broward County Florida, Citibank Na, Estate Of Celine Bataille, Deceased, Gotham Collection Services Corp, (total of 13) See All represented by Montes, Alix J, Navas, Javier, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with , Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore =/>$250,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is a verified second amended intent to reform and foreclose a mortgage on real property located in Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff, 1900 Capital Trust II, by U.S. Bank Trust National Association, is seeking to reform the mortgag...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Motion to Appoint Attorney Ad Litem
Date: June 05, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Affidavit for Service by Publication
Date: February 15, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: March 27, 2019Notice of Service
Date: May 30, 2019Certificate of Title
Date: September 13, 2022Motion for Substitution of Party(S)
Date: March 01, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: July 16, 2019Non-Military Affidavit
Date: November 12, 2021Memo
Date: November 14, 2019Notice of Service
Date: December 19, 2018Motion to Reset Sale Date
Date: June 01, 2020Certificate of Mailing
Date: June 01, 2021Motion for Leave to File
Date: October 30, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: November 12, 2021Certificate of Service
Date: August 17, 2021Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: February 17, 2020Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: August 17, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: November 30, 2018Order Substituting Party
Date: December 18, 2018Mot for Default--Default Not Entered
Date: July 26, 2019Oath of Guardian Attorney & Admin Ad Litem
Date: July 17, 2019Summons Returned Served
Date: February 16, 2018Answer
Date: July 17, 2019Joint Stipulation
Date: May 03, 2022Order Extending Time
Date: February 13, 2019Not of Filing Original Note & Mortgage
Date: November 20, 2019Proof of Publication
Date: March 05, 2018Memo
Date: August 19, 2019Proof of Publication
Date: March 03, 2020Order Setting
Date: August 21, 2019Bid Sheet
Date: September 02, 2022Order Substituting Party
Date: September 23, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 14, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: March 25, 2022Order Setting
Date: August 20, 2019Motion for Substitution of Party(S)
Date: June 21, 2018Order Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale
Date: August 26, 2020eSummons Issuance
Date: January 20, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: March 11, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Final Disposition Form
Date: May 23, 2022Mot for Default--Default Not Entered
Date: August 07, 2019Notice of Service
Date: July 02, 2019Request
Date: July 15, 2019Order
Date: December 18, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: February 13, 2019Notice of Service
Date: November 04, 2020Notice of Service
Date: August 23, 2019Motion for Default
Date: July 15, 2019Report of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: June 02, 2021Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: August 17, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: March 15, 2021Certificate of Service
Date: May 23, 2022Final Disposition Form
Date: November 20, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: August 04, 2020Lis Pendens
Date: January 20, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Service
Date: February 22, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: June 20, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 29, 2019Summons Returned Served
Date: February 16, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 17, 2018eSummons Issuance - On Amended
Date: May 28, 2019Motion for Default
Date: May 28, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Lis Pendens
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Action
Date: February 15, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 16, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 16, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: June 14, 2019eSummons Issuance - On Amended
Date: April 09, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Amended Lis Pendens
Date: April 05, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: April 04, 2019Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party Plaintiff
Date: March 27, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: May 23, 2019eSummons Issuance - On Amended
Date: April 09, 2019eSummons Issuance - On Amended
Date: April 09, 2019Value Claim Form
Date: January 26, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: May 23, 2019Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Administrator
Date: July 01, 2019Non-Military Affidavit
Date: May 28, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 29, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: June 07, 2019Statement of Facts
Date: May 28, 2019Amendment to Complaint
Date: April 05, 2019Motion for Substitution of Counsel
Date: May 07, 2019Summons Returned Served
Date: February 16, 2018Default
Date: May 28, 2019Summons Returned Served
Date: February 16, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 16, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: April 22, 2019Summons Returned Served
Date: May 23, 2019Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: July 01, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: March 27, 2019Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 01, 2019Summons Returned Served
Date: February 16, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: July 16, 2019Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale
Date: October 27, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 17, 2019Certificate of Service
Date: September 24, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Emergency Motion
Date: October 26, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: February 26, 2018Motion for Substitution of Counsel
Date: May 27, 2021Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: September 22, 2020Motion for Substitution of Party(S)
Date: August 18, 2021Notice of Service
Date: July 30, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: May 23, 2022Witness & Exhibit List
Date: October 29, 2019Answer
Date: March 02, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: February 26, 2018Certificate of Sale
Date: September 02, 2022Response
Date: November 18, 2019Proof of Publication
Date: October 07, 2020Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: May 28, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: January 23, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: February 13, 2019Certificate of Disbursements
Date: September 13, 2022Notice of Change of Address
Date: November 15, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: May 20, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: September 03, 2021Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: July 28, 2020Motion to Vacate Final Judgment
Date: December 22, 2020Witness & Exhibit List
Date: August 23, 2019Affidavit of Proof of Publication
Date: June 07, 2022Motion for Substitution of Counsel
Date: May 07, 2019Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 01, 2019Statement of Facts
Date: May 28, 2019Response
Date: November 18, 2019Motion to Reset Sale Date
Date: June 01, 2020Amendment to Complaint
Date: April 05, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title & Certificate of Disbursement Mailed | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title & Certificate of Disbursement Emailed | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale & Proof of Publication Mailed | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale & Proof of Publication Emailed | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale | |
September 01, 2022 | Hearing | Foreclosure Sale | |
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Proof of Publication |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.