Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bower, Robert M., Regency House Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Chiarello, Anthony, Esq., Holodak, Edward F, Esq., against Bower, Robert M., Regency House Inc., represented by Chiarello, Anthony, Esq., Holodak, Edward F, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Haury, William W., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedJanuary 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This is a complaint filed in the Circuit Court of the 17th Judicial Circuit in and for
Broward County, Florida by plaintiff Regency House against defendant Owner. The complaint
alleges that Owner is a member of and defendant to the plaintiff cooperat...
Agreed Order
Date: November 27, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: April 14, 2020Notice of Unavailability
Date: December 11, 2018Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: June 11, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: April 14, 2020Amended Witness List
Date: August 04, 2021Request for Production
Date: March 06, 2020Order Setting Final Hearing
Date: October 09, 2023Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 23, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: October 03, 2018Calendar Call-Order Resetting Trial
Date: March 25, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 26, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: March 02, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: November 06, 2018Notice
Date: March 06, 2020Notice of Service of Expert Interrogatories
Date: August 04, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: July 15, 2021Motion to Amend
Date: April 06, 2020Notice of Cancellation
Date: September 01, 2023Response to Request for Production
Date: April 07, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: July 15, 2021Lis Pendens
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Unavailability
Date: July 20, 2021Order Resetting Hearing
Date: October 10, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: December 05, 2023Expert Witness List
Date: July 26, 2021Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 20, 2018Request to Produce
Date: August 21, 2018Expert Interrogatories
Date: August 18, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: August 23, 2021Notice for/of Trial
Date: August 20, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: September 03, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: May 02, 2023Response to Motion
Date: November 15, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: November 06, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: August 31, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: October 17, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: April 17, 2023Motion to Consolidate
Date: November 01, 2018Answer to Counterclaim
Date: March 02, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: January 02, 2019Order of Referral to General Magistrate
Date: October 27, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: February 11, 2020Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: March 03, 2020Motion for Continuance
Date: October 25, 2023Response to Motion
Date: May 20, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 30, 2021Request for Production
Date: June 11, 2021Request to Produce
Date: August 18, 2021Summons Returned Served
Date: April 18, 2023Witness & Exhibit List
Date: August 20, 2021Request for Production
Date: August 04, 2021Objection
Date: March 30, 2023Response to Motion
Date: August 22, 2023Order Setting Hearing
Date: March 13, 2023Order Granting Motion for Judgment
Date: March 10, 2023Witness & Exhibit List
Date: January 27, 2020Notice of Filing
Date: March 10, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: August 16, 2019Motion to Take Judicial Notice
Date: February 04, 2020Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: March 16, 2021Motion
Date: March 16, 2021Response to Motion
Date: March 17, 2021Opposition
Date: March 23, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 18, 2020Order Granting Motion for Continuance
Date: March 24, 2021Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: May 18, 2020Order
Date: March 15, 2023Subpoena for Trial
Date: March 29, 2023Calendar Call-Order Resetting Trial
Date: September 19, 2019Motion for Leave
Date: March 10, 2023Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: February 26, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: May 07, 2020Order
Date: May 11, 2020Order Resetting
Date: March 12, 2021Order
Date: March 11, 2023Supplemental
Date: March 12, 2023Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: May 27, 2020Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: January 08, 2020Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 22, 2020Response to Request for Production
Date: October 01, 2021Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 01, 2021Notice of Unavailability
Date: March 17, 2023Response
Date: August 19, 2019Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: December 19, 2019Response to Request to Produce
Date: February 13, 2019Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: September 13, 2021Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: September 17, 2021Answer to Complaint
Date: March 19, 2019Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 21, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 29, 2019Agreed Order
Date: February 28, 2018Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: January 23, 2020Notice of Cancellation
Date: September 30, 2021Order
Date: September 30, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: September 15, 2021Agreed Order
Date: September 19, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 28, 2019Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: January 03, 2019Order on Motion to Compel
Date: February 27, 2019Expert Witness List
Date: September 27, 2021Request to Produce
Date: September 21, 2021Notice of Mediation
Date: September 16, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: August 19, 2019Response
Date: September 17, 2021Order Granting Motion to Amend
Date: February 04, 2020Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 21, 2021Order Granting Motion
Date: March 02, 2020Notice of Change of Address
Date: May 31, 2022Counterclaim
Date: July 04, 2018Subpoena Issued By Attorney
Date: August 19, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: May 28, 2019Witness List
Date: January 28, 2020Agreed Order
Date: February 27, 2019Response to Request for Admissions
Date: January 02, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: January 07, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: March 06, 2023Response to Request for Production
Date: January 07, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 21, 2019Agreed Order
Date: September 19, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 28, 2019Notice of Video Deposition
Date: January 29, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: August 29, 2019Request for Copies
Date: August 20, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: February 10, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: December 19, 2019Answer to Interrogs
Date: October 01, 2021Motion
Date: October 20, 2021Agreed Order
Date: October 20, 2021Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: February 19, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: August 24, 2018Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: October 24, 2018Motion to Amend Complaint
Date: November 14, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: January 02, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: December 04, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 04, 2020Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: February 06, 2020Request for Production
Date: August 26, 2021Expert Witness List
Date: August 04, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: March 30, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: April 26, 2021Request
Date: September 01, 2021Motion for Final Judgment
Date: April 28, 2023Notice of Video Deposition
Date: August 17, 2021Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: August 20, 2021Agreed Order
Date: February 04, 2020Answer to Counterclaim
Date: July 23, 2018Counterclaim
Date: February 25, 2020Motion to Appear Telephonically
Date: February 21, 2020Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: March 06, 2020Supplemental Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 24, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: August 05, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: July 12, 2021Witness List
Date: July 26, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: July 13, 2018Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: August 26, 2021eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Agreed Order
Date: April 18, 2023Summons Returned Served
Date: April 18, 2023Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 17, 2018Motion for Continuance
Date: October 25, 2023Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
Date: August 21, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 07, 2020Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 18, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: August 21, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: February 10, 2020Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: September 07, 2021Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 10, 2020Answer to Complaint
Date: July 17, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 15, 2019Answer to Counterclaim
Date: January 02, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: January 15, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 16, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 26, 2019Motion for Final Judgment
Date: January 09, 2023Notice of Unavailability
Date: July 18, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: August 16, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: January 12, 2023Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 17, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: August 19, 2019Amended Response to Request for Production
Date: May 28, 2019Order Setting Hearing
Date: March 09, 2023Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: July 25, 2019Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: January 16, 2019Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: October 27, 2020Notice to Set Case for Trial
Date: September 10, 2020Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum
Date: November 18, 2019Exhibit List
Date: January 28, 2020Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: December 19, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: January 24, 2019Request for Admissions
Date: September 21, 2021Motion for Order to Show Cause
Date: August 16, 2019Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 27, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: September 29, 2021Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: September 28, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: March 09, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: February 10, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: February 10, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing December 11, 2023 |
|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Referral to General Magistrate | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance PLAINTIFF REGENCY HOUSE, INC.'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance AMENDED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCEParty: Plaintiff Regency House Inc |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting Hearing 10-30-2023 at 2:15 p.m rm 16165 |
|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Final Hearing 11-01-2023 at 10:30 am rm 16165 |
|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Response to Motion | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.