Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Saltzman, Tara, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Abramowitz, Ross, against Trg New River Ii Ltd, represented by Shaw, James M, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryNeg - Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Tara Saltzman against TRG New River II, LTD d/b/a New River Yacht Club. The plaintiff alleges that on March 24, 2016, while on the defendant's premises located at 400 SW 15th Avenue, Fort Lauderdale, Broward County, Florida...
Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: May 23, 2018Notice of Supplemental Authority
Date: February 15, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 11, 2018Motion for Continuance
Date: February 18, 2019Agreed Order
Date: July 17, 2018Request for Production
Date: February 18, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: February 18, 2019Interrogatories & Notice of Filing
Date: February 18, 2019Amended Request to Produce
Date: July 16, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 23, 2019Notice of Supplemental Authority
Date: February 20, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 17, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 26, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 11, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: August 10, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: August 21, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 23, 2018Request for Production
Date: February 27, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: September 06, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: November 30, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: September 18, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: September 04, 2018Interrogatories & Notice of Filing
Date: December 27, 2018Request for Production
Date: December 27, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: September 04, 2018Request for Production
Date: November 01, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: November 09, 2018Notice of Interrogatories
Date: February 27, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 05, 2018Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: March 07, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 21, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: March 22, 2018Privilege Log
Date: March 29, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 29, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: March 30, 2018Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: April 02, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 02, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: January 25, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: January 25, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: February 01, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 13, 2019Response to Request to Produce
Date: April 04, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 04, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: February 15, 2019Subpoena Duces Tecum W/O Deposition Returned Served
Date: April 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Supplemental Authority AMENDEDParty: Defendant TRG New River II LTD |
|
February 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance Party: Plaintiff Saltzman, Tara |
|
February 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
February 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Interrogatories & Notice of Filing | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Supplemental Authority Party: Defendant TRG New River II LTD |
|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.