Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Us Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Schultz, Andrea, against Duncan, Nora, Duncan, Robert, represented by Khan, Faequa A, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore =/>$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a verified complaint to foreclose a mortgage and for reestablishment of a lost note. The plaintiff, U.S. Bank, N.A., successor trustee to LaSalle Bank National Association, on behalf of the holders of Bear Stearns Asset Backed Secur...
Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: March 16, 2018Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic
Date: March 16, 2018Final Disposition Form
Date: November 28, 2018Motion to Withdraw
Date: December 13, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 02, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: April 16, 2018Order Granting Motion to Withdraw
Date: December 17, 2018Order Granting Motion
Date: April 16, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: April 16, 2018Notice of Service
Date: December 18, 2018Notice of Service
Date: April 19, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: May 07, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: January 31, 2019Notice of Service
Date: May 21, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 21, 2018Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: March 21, 2019Affidavit of Costs & Interest
Date: April 23, 2019Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale
Date: April 29, 2019Notice of Withdrawal
Date: June 03, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: May 21, 2018Ord Setting Non-Jury Trial
Date: June 25, 2018Witness & Exhibit List
Date: September 27, 2018Notice of Service
Date: July 03, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: August 16, 2018Ord Setting Non-Jury Trial
Date: June 25, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Service
Date: June 26, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 01, 2018Request for Production
Date: July 03, 2018Value Claim Form
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: January 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018Motion to Take Judicial Notice
Date: October 01, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 15, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 15, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 15, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: October 10, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: February 23, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 12, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: November 28, 2018Motion for Writ of Possession
Date: May 23, 2019Certificate of Title
Date: May 14, 2019Emergency Motion
Date: April 29, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: May 23, 2019Certificate of Sale
Date: May 01, 2019Non-Military Affidavit
Date: May 23, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: May 23, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 03, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Proof of Publication
Date: January 24, 2019Non-Military Affidavit
Date: January 31, 2019Bid Sheet
Date: May 01, 2019Request for Production
Date: July 03, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal | |
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
May 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Re-open Fee Payor: DANIEL BARBAGELATA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A073385; ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Writ of Possession Party: Plaintiff US Bank NA |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing JUNE 19, 2019 AT 1:30 PM PURCHASER'S VERIFIED MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit Party: Defendant Duncan, Nora Defendant Duncan, Robert |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance GREGORY WALLACHParty: Plaintiff US Bank NA |
|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title Mailed | |
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title Emailed | |
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.