Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cypress Tree Condominium Assn Inc, filed a(n) Condominium - Property case represented by Katz, Steven B., Esq., against Senior Irrevocable Family Trust, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2018 |
CategoryCondominium Action |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeCondominium |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Cypress Tree Condominium Association, Inc. against The Senior Irrevocable Family Trust and unknown tenants in possession of a property located in Broward County, Florida. The plaintiff is a condominium ...
Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 26, 2018Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: January 26, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: February 26, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 02, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 02, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 02, 2018Order Granting Motion to Quash
Date: September 18, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: September 26, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: November 09, 2018Affidavit
Date: January 09, 2019Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: January 30, 2020Affidavit
Date: January 09, 2019Affidavit of Attorney Fees
Date: January 09, 2019Motion for Final Judgment
Date: January 09, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: January 15, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: April 18, 2019Motion to Dismiss
Date: June 04, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: July 24, 2019Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: January 30, 2020Consent to Substitution of Counsel
Date: January 30, 2020eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 26, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 26, 2018Motion to Quash
Date: September 13, 2018eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: September 26, 2018eSummons Issuance - Alias
Date: September 26, 2018Notice of Dropping Parties- Generic
Date: October 29, 2018Affidavit of Amounts Due
Date: January 09, 2019Summons Returned Unserved
Date: November 09, 2018Affidavit of Costs
Date: January 09, 2019Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: February 07, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for Substitution of Counsel | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel STEVEN B. KATZ FBN: 41255Party: Plaintiff Cypress Tree Condominium Assn Inc |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Consent to Substitution of Counsel STEVEN B. KATZ FBN:41255Party: Plaintiff Cypress Tree Condominium Assn Inc |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant Senior Irrevocable Family Trust |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Management Conference 06-12-2019 8:45 AM |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Hearing | |
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit AS TO COLLECTION COSTS OF ASSOCIATION SOLUTIONS GROUP ASG |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.