Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Branch Banking And Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Seiden, Jeffrey M, Esq., against Hampton Hills Community Association, Inc., Hampton Hills Condominium Association, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage Llc, Rinaldi, John, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Branch Banking and Trust Company (the "Plaintiff") against John Rinaldi, the Unknown Spouse of John Rinaldi, Hampton Hills Community Association, Inc., Hampton Hills Condominium Association, Inc., and N...
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: January 24, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 13, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Value Claim Form
Date: January 24, 2018Answer
Date: January 29, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 13, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 13, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 13, 2018Final Disposition Form
Date: February 19, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 13, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 02/10/2018 Unknown Spouse of John Rinaldi |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 2/10/2018Party: Defendant Rinaldi, John |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 29th day of January, 2018Party: Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/29/2(118Party: Defendant Hampton Hills Community Association, Inc. |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 1/29/2018Party: Defendant Hampton Hills Condominium Association, Inc. |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer Party: Defendant Hampton Hills Community Association, Inc. |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: JEFFREY MICHAEL SEIDEN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A012060; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid Payor: JEFFREY MICHAEL SEIDEN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A012060; ;Amount: $906.00 |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.