Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Abs Reo Trust Iii, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Swartz, Sean Matthew, against Banyan Lakes Homeowners Assn Inc, Flagstar Bank Fsb, Mehdi Daneshzadeh, Nicole Mitchell, United States Of America On Behalf Of The Small Bu, (total of 5) See All represented by Weber, Lauren H, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore =/>$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a verified complaint to foreclose a mortgage and reestablish a promissory note. The plaintiff, ABS REO Trust III, is suing Mehdi Daneshzadeh, Nicole Mitchell, the unknown spouse of Nicole Mitchell, Banyan Lakes Homeowners Associatio...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: January 24, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 14, 2018Value Claim Form
Date: January 24, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 12, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 12, 2018Affidavit of Diligent Search
Date: April 03, 2018Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: March 20, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 20, 2018Affidavit of Diligent Search
Date: April 09, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: April 03, 2018Motion for Default
Date: June 11, 2018Notice of Action
Date: April 10, 2018Default
Date: June 11, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: August 03, 2018Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 27, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: September 20, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: November 02, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: November 30, 2018Notice
Date: November 23, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: November 02, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: December 18, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: December 12, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: December 07, 2018Notice of Service
Date: January 30, 2019Request for Production
Date: January 30, 2019Notice
Date: January 30, 2019Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: February 04, 2019Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 05, 2019Notice of Service
Date: February 04, 2019Order Setting
Date: February 04, 2019Certificate of Service
Date: February 11, 2019Notice of Service
Date: March 25, 2019Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: March 08, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: March 26, 2019Motion for Summary Final Judgment
Date: June 05, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: June 18, 2019Final Disposition Form
Date: June 18, 2019Certificate of Service
Date: June 24, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 07, 2019Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: September 06, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: September 25, 2019Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: October 04, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: October 14, 2019Certificate of Service
Date: October 17, 2019Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale
Date: October 16, 2019Proof of Publication
Date: December 10, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: January 02, 2020Order Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale
Date: January 07, 2020Response to Motion
Date: January 06, 2020Bid Sheet
Date: January 08, 2020Certificate of Disbursements
Date: January 22, 2020Certificate of Service
Date: January 08, 2020Certificate of Title
Date: January 22, 2020Certificate of Sale
Date: January 08, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: February 04, 2020Letter Returned From Post Office
Date: March 23, 2020Letter Returned From Post Office
Date: August 06, 2020eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 15, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: February 16, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: March 14, 2018Affidavit of Diligent Search
Date: April 03, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: April 03, 2018Affidavit for Service by Publication
Date: April 09, 2018Notice of Action
Date: April 25, 2018Non-Military Affidavit
Date: June 11, 2018Order Denying Motion
Date: September 18, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: September 18, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: September 18, 2018Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: October 19, 2018Status Report
Date: October 19, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: October 30, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: October 30, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 30, 2019Status Report
Date: December 06, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: December 12, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: December 19, 2018Status Report
Date: January 30, 2019Order Setting
Date: February 05, 2019Request for Production of Documents
Date: February 05, 2019Certificate of Service
Date: April 16, 2019Request
Date: June 12, 2019Proof of Publication
Date: September 20, 2019Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale
Date: September 25, 2019Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: November 21, 2019Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Date: October 30, 2018Agreed Order
Date: April 09, 2019Request
Date: June 13, 2019Motion to Cancel & Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: January 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Letter Returned From Post Office | |
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Letter Returned From Post Office | |
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title & Certificate of Disbursement Mailed | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Plaintiff ABS Reo Trust III |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale & Proof of Publication Mailed | |
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.