Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Reverse Mortgage Funding Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Santiago, Samuel F, against Steinberg, Estelle, Sunrise Lakes Condominium Apts Phase 3 Inc 3, United States Of America, represented by Sugarman, Deborah S, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop Non-Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by James B. Nutter & Company against Estelle Steinberg, the unknown spouse of Estelle Steinberg, Sunrise Lakes Condominium Apts., Phase 3, Inc. 3, and the United States of America on behalf of the Secretar...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Value Claim Form
Date: January 24, 2018Lis Pendens
Date: January 24, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 24, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 28, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: February 01, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 22, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: February 01, 2018Affidavit of Service
Date: March 09, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: May 15, 2019Certificate of Title
Date: August 27, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: April 01, 2019Certificate of Sale
Date: August 15, 2019Motion for Substitution of Party(S)
Date: January 22, 2019Affidavit of Attorney Fees
Date: June 27, 2019Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: July 09, 2018Final Disposition Form
Date: July 10, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: February 11, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: July 08, 2019Proof of Publication
Date: July 26, 2019Notice of Action
Date: April 11, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: July 05, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: May 06, 2019Assignment of Bid
Date: July 15, 2019Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: April 01, 2019Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Date: July 15, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: July 03, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: February 12, 2019Certificate of Mailing
Date: April 11, 2018Order Setting Case Management Conference
Date: February 11, 2019Order Granting Motion to Substitute Party Plaintiff
Date: February 11, 2019Motion for Default & Default
Date: March 28, 2018Affidavit
Date: August 27, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: January 22, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: October 04, 2018Bid Sheet
Date: August 15, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 21, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: September 06, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: January 24, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 28, 2018Summons Returned Unserved
Date: February 28, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: February 28, 2018Notice of Action
Date: April 26, 2018Proof of Publication
Date: May 01, 2018Motion for Default & Default
Date: August 27, 2018Letter Returned From Post Office
Date: September 14, 2018Motion for Writ of Possession
Date: September 06, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: September 18, 2019Certificate of Disbursements
Date: August 27, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title & Certificate of Disbursement Emailed | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title & Certificate of Disbursement Mailed | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION/ ATTORNEY H MICHAEL SOLLOA JR FBN: 37854 |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Writ of Possession FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION/ ATTORNEY H MICHAEL SOLLOA JR FBN: 37854 |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Re-open Fee Payor: TRIPP SCOTT ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A166664; ;Amount: $50.00 |
|
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale & Proof of Publication Mailed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.