Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Runcie, Karmel, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Lewis, Chelsea A, against International Village Association Inc., Syrilk, Doreen, Tenant Evauation Llc, represented by Klein, Daniel Jacob, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Frink, Keathan B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Libel/Slander |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Karmel Runcie against International Village Association, Inc. (IVA) and Doreen Syrlik. Runcie alleges defamation per se and violations of the Fair Credit Reporting Act (FCRA), the Fair Housing Act (FHA), and the Florida Civ...
Second Amended Complaint
Date: August 13, 2018Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: August 22, 2018Notice of Court Appearance
Date: February 12, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 13, 2018Notice of Service
Date: February 20, 2018Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 30, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: February 26, 2018Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 20, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 01, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 05, 2018Answer to Interrogs
Date: October 03, 2018Request for Examination
Date: March 12, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: March 16, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: March 16, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: November 26, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: November 15, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: November 15, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 26, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 03, 2018Agreed Order
Date: April 04, 2018Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 06, 2018Request for Production of Documents
Date: December 26, 2018Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 11, 2018Subpoena for Deposition Returned Served
Date: December 24, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: December 26, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: December 27, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: April 17, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: April 18, 2018Agreed Order
Date: April 20, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 07, 2019Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: January 08, 2019Order Granting Leave to Amend Complaint
Date: May 01, 2018Request for Production
Date: May 07, 2018Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: May 07, 2018Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: January 17, 2019Agreed Order
Date: May 14, 2018Notice of Withdrawal
Date: May 15, 2018Amended Response to Request for Production
Date: May 15, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: January 23, 2019Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: May 24, 2018Amended Response to Request for Production
Date: May 30, 2018Agreed Order
Date: June 06, 2018Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: June 29, 2018Notice of Readiness for Trial
Date: January 24, 2019Amended Motion
Date: July 23, 2018Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: July 12, 2018Motion for Disqualification
Date: July 23, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: July 26, 2018Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: July 30, 2018Order Granting Motion to Stay
Date: February 07, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: February 01, 2019Request for Production
Date: August 14, 2018Motion
Date: February 11, 2019Motion to Strike
Date: August 20, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: August 23, 2018Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: August 27, 2018Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: August 27, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: September 12, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: September 12, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: September 14, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: September 12, 2018Response
Date: September 17, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: September 26, 2018Order Denying Motion
Date: October 05, 2018Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: October 05, 2018Notice of Intent
Date: March 25, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: October 08, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: October 09, 2018Response to Motion
Date: October 15, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: March 26, 2019Order Denying
Date: October 16, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: October 16, 2018Third Amended Complaint
Date: October 23, 2018Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: March 28, 2019Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: November 02, 2018Order on Motion to Compel
Date: October 29, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: November 02, 2018Order on Motion to Compel
Date: October 29, 2018Response to Motion
Date: December 11, 2018Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: April 08, 2019Order Denying Motion
Date: December 18, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: December 24, 2018Notice of Video Deposition
Date: April 19, 2019Request for Admissions
Date: April 16, 2019Notice of Video Deposition
Date: April 19, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: April 19, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: April 22, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: April 19, 2019Motion for Sanctions
Date: December 24, 2018Motion
Date: April 22, 2019Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: April 23, 2019Subpoena for Deposition Returned Served
Date: December 24, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 24, 2019Request for Production
Date: April 25, 2019Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: December 28, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: April 26, 2019Not of Intent to Serve Subpoenas Under Rule 1.351
Date: December 29, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: April 29, 2019Motion to Strike
Date: January 07, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: April 30, 2019Agreed Order
Date: April 27, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: January 07, 2019Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 01, 2019Notice of Appearance
Date: January 09, 2019Certificate of No Objection
Date: January 09, 2019Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: May 01, 2019Agreed Order
Date: January 16, 2019Order
Date: January 16, 2019Response to Motion
Date: May 01, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: May 01, 2019Amended Response to Request for Production
Date: May 02, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: January 18, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: January 22, 2019Request for Production
Date: May 04, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: January 23, 2019Privilege Log
Date: January 23, 2019Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: May 07, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: May 07, 2019Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: May 08, 2019Witness List
Date: May 10, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 23, 2019Response to Request for Admissions
Date: January 23, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: January 24, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 21, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: May 28, 2019Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: June 04, 2019Motion to Compel/Impose Sanctions
Date: January 24, 2019Interrogatories & Notice of Service
Date: January 25, 2019Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: January 24, 2019Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: January 24, 2019Motion for Sanctions
Date: January 30, 2019Notice of Filing
Date: January 30, 2019Order Granting Motion to Compel
Date: January 31, 2019Notice
Date: February 01, 2019Motion to Stay
Date: February 07, 2019Privilege Log
Date: February 01, 2019Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 03, 2019Notice
Date: February 19, 2019Notice of Mediation
Date: February 11, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: February 16, 2019Certificate
Date: February 20, 2019Response
Date: February 22, 2019Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: March 21, 2019Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: March 25, 2019Motion for Sanctions
Date: March 25, 2019Response to Request for Production
Date: March 26, 2019Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 26, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: March 27, 2019Request for Production
Date: March 28, 2019Notice of Withdrawal
Date: March 28, 2019Mediation Report
Date: March 28, 2019Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 29, 2019Motion for Sanctions
Date: April 01, 2019Response
Date: April 03, 2019Notice of Filing Affidavit
Date: April 03, 2019Order Denying Motion
Date: April 04, 2019Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: April 09, 2019Order Granting Motion
Date: April 10, 2019Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: April 10, 2019Notice of Video Deposition
Date: April 15, 2019Notice of Video Deposition
Date: April 15, 2019Notice of Video Deposition
Date: April 15, 2019Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: April 16, 2019Motion for Protective Order
Date: April 18, 2019Notice of Video Deposition
Date: April 24, 2019Notice of Video Deposition
Date: April 26, 2019Notice of Video Deposition
Date: April 26, 2019Summons Returned Served
Date: April 26, 2019Request for Production
Date: May 01, 2019Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 20, 2018Order for Substitution of Counsel
Date: February 27, 2018Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 21, 2018Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: June 11, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: June 26, 2018Amended Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: August 30, 2018Response
Date: September 26, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: September 18, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: November 12, 2018Answer to Amended Complaint
Date: November 02, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 28, 2019Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: February 20, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 17, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 17, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 30, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 17, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 18, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 18, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 18, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 12, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: January 30, 2018Request for Production
Date: February 14, 2018Notice of Interrogatories
Date: February 20, 2018Agreed Order
Date: February 20, 2018Request for Production
Date: February 20, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: February 20, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 05, 2018Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 08, 2018Notice to Produce
Date: March 12, 2018Notice of Filing Interrogs
Date: March 12, 2018Notice of Filing
Date: March 15, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: March 20, 2018Response
Date: March 20, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 22, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: March 26, 2018Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 23, 2018Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories
Date: March 28, 2018Order Extending Time
Date: March 27, 2018Motion to Amend Complaint
Date: April 03, 2018Amended Response to Request for Production
Date: April 05, 2018Notice
Date: April 06, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 11, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 16, 2018Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 11, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: April 18, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: April 11, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: April 11, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: April 12, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: May 07, 2018Order Denying Motion
Date: April 24, 2018Motion to Amend Complaint
Date: April 24, 2018Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: April 24, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: May 01, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: May 06, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: May 11, 2018Summons Returned Served
Date: May 22, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: May 24, 2018Order on Motion to Compel
Date: May 29, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: June 06, 2018Response to Request for Production
Date: June 06, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: June 06, 2018Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel
Date: June 27, 2018Motion to Amend Complaint
Date: July 23, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: July 25, 2018Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: August 06, 2018Order Granting Leave to Amend Complaint
Date: August 13, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 17, 2018Order
Date: August 13, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal | |
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation | |
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Hearing | |
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
May 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Production | |
May 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Production |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.