Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Seleznev, Leo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nipon, Michael, against Suarez, Tanya Ann, represented by Kearley, Richard C, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Rodriguez, Carlos Augusto presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a legal case filed by the plaintiff, Leo Seleznev, against the defendant, Tanya Ann Suarez. The plaintiff is seeking damages that exceed $15,000. The plaintiff is a resident of Broward County, Florida, while the defendant was a resi...
eSummons Issuance
Date: January 16, 2018Reply to Affirmative Defenses
Date: March 10, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 10, 2018Cross Notice to Produce Documents
Date: April 11, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: March 26, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: March 26, 2018Request for Production
Date: March 26, 2018Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: March 26, 2018Notice
Date: March 26, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: March 28, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: March 26, 2018Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: April 10, 2018Request for Copies
Date: April 17, 2018Response to Request for Admissions
Date: April 17, 2018Certificate of No Objection
Date: April 20, 2018Re-Notice of Taking Deposition
Date: May 15, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: April 20, 2018Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement
Date: April 24, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 16, 2018Answer to Complaint
Date: March 07, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: March 10, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: March 10, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Re-Notice of Taking Deposition | |
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of No Objection | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Copies | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Admissions | |
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Cross Notice to Produce Documents | |
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Production From Non-Party | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Suarez, Tanya Ann |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Response to Request for Admissions Party: Defendant Suarez, Tanya Ann |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.