Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Arce, Carlos, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Reynolds, Robert A., Esq., against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Brant, Todd E, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Perlman, Sandra presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryOther - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed in the Circuit Court in and for Broward County, Florida by Carlos Arce and Olga Rodriguez-Arce against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiffs are seeking damages in excess of $15,000. The plaintiffs ar...
Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 13, 2018Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: January 08, 2018Request for Production
Date: January 08, 2018Request for Admissions
Date: January 08, 2018Complaint (eFiled)
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: January 08, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: January 08, 2018eSummons Issuance
Date: January 08, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 09, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: February 13, 2018Amended Complaint
Date: July 03, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: August 06, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: January 25, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance for DefendantParty: Defendant Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company |
|
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint And Olga Rodriguez-ArceParty: Plaintiff Arce, Carlos |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss FOR FAILURE TO JOIN AN INDISPENSABLE PARTYParty: Defendant Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSParty: Defendant Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance TODD E. BRANT, ESQ.Party: Defendant Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company |
|
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Payor: KENNETH R DUBOFF ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A003245; ;Amount: $401.00 |
|
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Fee Payor: KENNETH R DUBOFF ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A003245; ;Amount: $10.00 |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Interrogs ON UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANYParty: Plaintiff Arce, Carlos |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Production ON UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANYParty: Plaintiff Arce, Carlos |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.