Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Diaz, Julissa, against Board Of County Commissioners Of Broward County Fl, Housing Finance Author Of Lee County Florida, Ruth Joseph, State Of Florida Broward County, represented by Belleh, Owei Z., Burnett, Philip L, Esq., Teitler, Robert Lon, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2015 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a verified complaint to foreclose a mortgage filed by Bank of America, N.A. against Ruth Joseph, also known as Joseph Ruth, and other defendants. The complaint alleges that Ruth Joseph executed a promissory note and a mortgage secur...
Answer to Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 06, 2016Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale
Date: October 24, 2016Answer
Date: August 17, 2015Complaint (eFiled)
Date: July 30, 2015Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 26, 2016Order Denying Motion
Date: November 17, 2015Motion to Dismiss
Date: October 27, 2016Response
Date: January 28, 2016Agreed Order
Date: March 01, 2016Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 31, 2015Order Denying Motion
Date: November 17, 2015Response to Affirmative Defenses
Date: April 11, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Comment: original note and mortgage documents returned on 11/7/16 Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSUREParty: Plaintiff Bank of America NA Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
October 27, 2016 | Hearing |
Foreclosure Sale Per Order |
|
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Cancelling Foreclosure Sale granted Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Publication SALE 10/27/2016 Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 10/24/2016 @ 8:45 AM, RM 519 on PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL THE FORECLOSURE SALE SCHEDULED FOR OCTBER 27,2016 Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Party: Plaintiff Bank of America NA Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 27, 2016Party: Plaintiff Bank of America NA Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
August 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney
Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE CREATED FOR ORGINAL DOCS Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.