Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Brimm, Gweneth M, Esq., against Amtrust Bank, Coral Reef Club Homeowners Association Inc, Goodman, George, Olivares, Irma, represented by Citron, Michael A, Norman, Jeffrey Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Gundersen, Andrea Ruth presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 17, 2015 |
CategoryReal Prop Homestead Res Fore - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. against George Goodman, also known as George T. Goodman, and other defendants. The complaint alleges that George Goodman has defaulted on the promissory note and mortgage executed...
Final Disposition Form
Date: February 24, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 10, 2015Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: November 05, 2015Request for Production
Date: November 24, 2015Request for Admissions
Date: November 24, 2015Response to Request for Production
Date: December 21, 2015Order of Referral to General Magistrate
Date: March 25, 2016Motion for Continuance
Date: May 10, 2016Order Setting
Date: June 07, 2016Complaint (eFiled)
Date: July 17, 2015Answer to Complaint
Date: September 22, 2015Answer & Affirmative Defenses
Date: October 12, 2015Response to Request for Admissions
Date: December 08, 2015Order Setting
Date: March 25, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Form Other - Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Attorney Fees
Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Placing Case on Inactive Status
Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion TO ABATE OR STAY FORECLOSURE ACTION AND STRIKE NON-JURY TRIAL 09/13/16 Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
September 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO ABATE/STAY FORECLOSURE ACTION AND STRIKE ORDER SCHEDULING NON-JURY TRIAL & MEMORANDUM F LAW IN SUPPORTParty: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA
Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Witness List Party: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice AMENDED NOTICE OF SERVING ORDER SETTING NON- JURY FORECLOSURE TRIALParty: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List AMENDEDParty: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
August 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Witness List Party: Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank NA Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Witness & Exhibit List Party: Defendant Goodman, George Defendant Olivares, Irma Judge: 11 Gundersen, Andrea Ruth |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.