Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Williamson, Barbara, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Levine, Glen B., Esq., against Wynmoor Community Council, Inc., represented by Golden, John Dennis, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Lopane, Nicholas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2014 |
CategoryNeg - Premises Liability Residential |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is filed by Barbara Williamson against Wynmoor Community Council, Inc., a Florida Non Profit Corporation. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of the defendant regarding security measures on their premises. The incident in ques...
Objection Pursuant to Rule 1.351
Date: January 19, 2015Response to Request for Production
Date: July 22, 2015Motion
Date: July 30, 2015Notice of Mediation
Date: August 10, 2015Motion to Set Cause for Trial
Date: July 30, 2015Notice of Filing Answers to Interrogatories
Date: February 16, 2015Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: February 03, 2016Request for Production
Date: March 27, 2015Response to Request for Production
Date: April 20, 2015Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: January 08, 2015Order
Date: June 11, 2015Complaint (eFiled)
Date: August 27, 2014Order Setting
Date: September 10, 2015Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: September 23, 2014Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: June 12, 2015Notice of Production From Non-Party
Date: June 30, 2015Motion to Compel
Date: October 26, 2015Request for Copies (Pursuant to Rule 1.351)
Date: September 25, 2014Response to Request for Production
Date: October 22, 2014Request for Production
Date: October 14, 2014Response to Request for Production
Date: November 24, 2014Motion to Compel
Date: December 16, 2014Mediation Report
Date: November 03, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Dismissal STIPULATION FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICEParty: Plaintiff Williamson, Barbara Defendant Wynmoor Community Council, Inc. |
|
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Dismissal STIPULATION FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICEParty: Defendant Wynmoor Community Council, Inc. Plaintiff Williamson, Barbara |
|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Cancellation OF HEARING 11/09/2015 |
|
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing on November 9, 2015 at 8:45 a.m. in Rm. 998 |
|
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Party: Defendant Wynmoor Community Council, Inc. |
|
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate OF AUTHORITYParty: Defendant Wynmoor Community Council, Inc. |
|
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Setting PL's Motion to Set a Trial and Motion to Expedite Trial Date/Granted |
|
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Good Faith Form | |
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Mediation October 29, 2015 @ 1:30PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.